Ayoubi v. U.S. Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Firas Ayoubi
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A., American Family Insurance Co., Verizon Wireless, Wal-Mart Corp, Syncrony Bank N.A., Harlem Motors Inc., 700 Credit Co, United States of America, PNC Bank, Mercedes Aldridge, Louay Ihmud, Mojahed Ihmud, Bernard Smuda, Unknown Co-Conspirator, Unknown Wal-Mart Employee, Unknown Syncrony Bank Employee and Unknown PNC Bank Employee
Case Number: 1:2021cv06055
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Referring Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 15 COPY OF MINUTE ENTRY in 20cv7288 before the Executive Committee: Firas Ayoubi is a restricted filer in the Northern District of Illinois, see 20-cv-7288 #4 . Plaintiff filed 20cv7288 #9 December 9, 2021. The document should have been filed in Ayoubi v. U.S. Bank et al, 21-cv-6055. The Clerk shall file document #9 with a filing date of December 9, 2021 and docket a copy of this order in Ayoubi v. U.S. Bank et al, 21-cv-6055. The assigned judge can then review this document and proceed accordingly. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this order to Firas Ayoubi. (sm, )
January 3, 2022 Filing 14 LETTER from Firas Ayoubi dated 12/30/21. (rp, )
December 9, 2021 Filing 16 LETTER from Firas M. Ayoubi dated 12/9/21. (Filed per court order #15 .) (sm, )
November 22, 2021 Filing 13 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 11/22/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Executive Committee: The Executive Committee has reassigned this judge to the matter. This case has been properly removed from the Circuit Court of Cook County. Firas M. Ayoubi is currently under an Executive Committee filing restriction, see: IN THE MATTER OF FIRAS M. AYOUBI (20 CV 7288). After reviewing the documents, the case is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (lw, )
November 22, 2021 MAILED to plaintiff a copy of order #12 dated 11/22/2021. (lw, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Firas M. Ayoubi is currently under an Executive Committee filing restriction, see IN THE MATTER OF FIRAS M. AYOUBI (20 CV 7288). On November 12, 2021, the case was removed from the Circuit Court of Cook County and randomly assigned to the calendar of the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. The Executive Committee reassigns this case to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Signed by the Executive Committee on 11/19/2021. Mailed notice. (lw, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone status hearing set for 1/11/2022 is stricken. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant United States of America to Refer This Case to the Executive Committee for Screening and Dismissal (Ling, Ernest)
November 19, 2021 MAILED copy of the Clerk's Notice along with the Joint Consent Form to Plaintiff to Firas Ayoubi. (ng, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Firas Ayoubi to United States of America's notice of removal. (Exhibits) (rc, )
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wal-Mart Corp by Lucas Sun (Sun, Lucas)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wal-Mart Corp by James P. Balog (Balog, James)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to to plaintiff of record. (rc, )
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Telephone status hearing is set for 1/11/2022 at 9:15 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Defendant is directed to advise the Plaintiff of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 15, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ng, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Ernest Yi Ling as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United States of America (Ling, Ernest)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019 L 010219) filed by United States of America Ex.1, state court summons and complaint (Ling, Ernest)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ling, Ernest)
November 12, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayoubi v. U.S. Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firas Ayoubi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Corp
Represented By: James P. Balog
Represented By: Lucas Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syncrony Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harlem Motors Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 700 Credit Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Ernest Yi Ling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louay Ihmud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mojahed Ihmud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Smuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Co-Conspirator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wal-Mart Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Syncrony Bank Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown PNC Bank Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?