Grumpy Cat Limited v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: Grumpy Cat Limited
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Case Number: 1:2021cv06133
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Grumpy Cat Limited Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
December 27, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Grumpy Cat Limited Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 88 (Hierl, Michael)
December 21, 2021 Filing 33 PRELIMINARY Injunction Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/21/2021. Mailed notice(lk, )
December 21, 2021 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Teleconference Motion hearing held on 12/21/2021. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #25 is granted. Order to follow. Teleconference Status hearing set for 2/16/2022 at 9:15 AM. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Teleconference Motion hearing set for 12/21/2021 is reset for 9:30 AM (PLEASE NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLY). Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
December 16, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #25 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/21/2021 at 09:45 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
December 16, 2021 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grumpy Cat Limited as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto on 12/15/2021, answer due 1/5/2022. (Hierl, Michael)
December 15, 2021 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Teleconference Status and Motion hearing set for 12/20/2021 is stricken. Parties shall contact the emergency Judge to reset Motion hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
December 15, 2021 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #25 (Hierl, Michael)
December 15, 2021 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by Grumpy Cat Limited in support of motion for preliminary injunction #25 (Hierl, Michael)
December 15, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited for preliminary injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction (Hierl, Michael)
December 15, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. (lxk, )
December 3, 2021 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiff's Motion to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #23 is granted. Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in effect up to and including 12/20/2021. Teleconference Status hearing is reset for 12/20/2021 at 9:15 AM. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
December 1, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Hierl, Michael)
November 29, 2021 Filing 22 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by Grumpy Cat Limited. (Document not imaged) (nsf, )
November 22, 2021 Filing 21 SEALED Temporary Restraining Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/22/2021. Mailed notice(lk, )
November 22, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Teleconference Motion hearing held on 11/22/2021. Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file excess pages #8 and Motion for leave to file under seal #6 are granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #9 is granted. Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in effect up to and including 12/6/2021. Teleconference Status hearing set for 12/6/2021 at 9:15 AM. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Teleconference Motion hearing set for 11/22/2021 at 12:15 AM. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 18 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (ph, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 17 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 (Group Exhibit 1, List of Trademarks), #2 (Exhibit 2, List of Trademarks)) (ph, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Grumpy Cat Limited (Hierl, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 2 Part 5 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 2 Part 4 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 2 Part 3 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 2 Part 2 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Exhibit 2 Part 1 of Bundesen Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Grumpy Cat Limited in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #9 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Bundesen Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration Hierl Declaration, #4 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3)(Hierl, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication (Hierl, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited for leave to file excess pages Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Hierl, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Grumpy Cat Limited; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18881373. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael)
November 17, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cxr, )
November 17, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cxr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grumpy Cat Limited v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grumpy Cat Limited
Represented By: Robert Payton Mcmurray
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?