XYZ Corporation v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Plaintiff: XYZ Corporation
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Case Number: 1:2021cv06135
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by XYZ Corporation as to certain Defendants (Carter, Alison)
December 21, 2021 Filing 30 PRELIMINARY Injunction Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/21/2021. Mailed notice(lk, )
December 21, 2021 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Teleconference Motion hearing held on 12/21/2021. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #24 is granted. Order to follow. Teleconference Status hearing set for 2/16/2022 at 9:15 AM. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Status and Motion hearing set for 12/21/2021 is reset for 9:30 AM (PLEASE NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLY). Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
December 16, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by XYZ Corporation as to XYZ Corporation on 12/16/2021, answer due 1/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Quezada, Sofia)
December 16, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Sofia Quezada for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #24 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/21/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Quezada, Sofia)
December 16, 2021 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by XYZ Corporation in support of motion for preliminary injunction #24 (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Memorandum)(Quezada, Sofia)
December 16, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiff XYZ Corporation for preliminary injunction (Quezada, Sofia)
December 6, 2021 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiff's Motion to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #19 is granted. Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in effect up to and including 12/21/2021. Teleconference Status hearing is reset for 12/21/2021 at 9:15 AM. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Motion hearing set for 12/7/2021 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
December 3, 2021 Filing 22 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by Plaintiff. (jh, )
December 2, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Sofia Quezada for presentment of Sealed motion #19 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/7/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Quezada, Sofia)
December 2, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff XYZ Corporation in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Memorandum)(Quezada, Sofia) Modified on 12/23/2021 (jg, ).
December 2, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff XYZ Corporation to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Quezada, Sofia) Modified on 12/23/2021 (jg, ).
November 24, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A (jj, )
November 23, 2021 Filing 18 SEALED Temporary Restraining Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/23/2021. Mailed notice(lk, )
November 23, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Teleconference Motion hearing held on 11/23/2021. Plaintiff's Motion for electronic services of process #13 and Motion for leave to file under seal #5 are granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #11 is granted. Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in effect up to and including 12/7/2021. Teleconference Status hearing set for 12/7/2021 at 9:30 AM. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
November 22, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion hearing set for 11/24/2021 is reset for 11/23/2021 at 1:00 PM (PLEASE NOTE DATE AND TIME CHANGE) which will proceed via Teleconference. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Sofia Quezada for presentment of motion for leave to file #5 , motion for miscellaneous relief #13 , Sealed motion #11 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/24/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Quezada, Sofia)
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by XYZ Corporation in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #13 (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1-4)(Quezada, Sofia)
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff XYZ Corporation for Electronic Service of Process (Quezada, Sofia)
November 19, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff XYZ Corporation in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 - Part One, #4 Exhibit 2 - Part Two)(Quezada, Sofia) Modified on 12/23/2021 (jg, ).
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION (Ex Parte) by Plaintiff XYZ Corporation for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Quezada, Sofia) Modified on 12/23/2021 (jg, ).
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 MAILED to plaintiff's counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials(kl, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (kl, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 COMPLAINT by Plaintiff XYZ Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Schedule A)(Quezada, Sofia) Modified on 12/23/2021 (jg, ).
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff XYZ Corporation by Alison Carter (Carter, Alison)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by XYZ Corporation in support of motion for leave to file #5 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ann Marie Sullivan, #2 Declaration of Sandy Zhuang, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Quezada, Sofia)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff XYZ Corporation for leave to file Certain Documents under Seal and to Proceed Temporarily under a Pseudonym (Quezada, Sofia)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff XYZ Corporation by Sofia Quezada (Quezada, Sofia)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff XYZ Corporation by Ann Marie Sullivan (Sullivan, Ann Marie)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Quezada, Sofia)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Redacted) filed by XYZ Corporation; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18889000. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Schedule A)(Quezada, Sofia)
November 18, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mxo, )
November 18, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XYZ Corporation v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XYZ Corporation
Represented By: Ann Marie Sullivan
Represented By: Alison Carter
Represented By: Sofia Quezada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?