Shah v. NYP Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vivek Shah
Defendant: NYP Holdings, Inc., Associated Newspapers Limited, New York Daily News Company, Vox Media, LLC, The Smoking Gun, Ltd., E! Entertainment Television, LLC, The Atlantic Monthly Group LLC, CBS Studios, Inc., Inside Edition, Inc., Telepictures Productions, Inc., ABC News, Inc., FOX News Network, LLC and Does 1-100
Case Number: 1:2021cv06148
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants ABC News, Inc., Associated Newspapers Limited, CBS Studios, Inc., E! Entertainment Television, LLC, FOX News Network, LLC, Inside Edition, Inc., New York Daily News Company, Telepictures Productions, Inc., The Atlantic Monthly Group LLC, The Smoking Gun, Ltd., Vox Media, LLC (jxj, )
January 13, 2022 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: In light of plaintiff's filing an amended complaint #20 , the briefing schedule on defendant's motion to dismiss entered by the Court on 1/7/2022 #19 is stricken. Defendant's motion to dismiss #17 is stricken without prejudice. Responsive pleading to be filed by 2/3/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 12, 2022 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Vivek Shah against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Shah, Vivek)
January 7, 2022 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff to file a response to defendant's motion to dismiss #17 by 2/4/2022. Defendant to file a reply by 2/18/2022. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. Telephone status hearing set for 1/19/2022 is stricken. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by NYP Holdings, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit of Unpublished Materials)(Healey, Brendan)
January 7, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant NYP Holdings, Inc. (Healey, Brendan)
December 13, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant NYP Holdings, Inc. by Sharon Renae Albrecht (Albrecht, Sharon)
December 8, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant NYP Holdings, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint #14 is granted. Defendant shall have until 01/07/2022 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. No appearance necessary on 12/10/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 7, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant NYP Holdings, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Healey, Brendan)
December 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Brendan J. Healey for presentment of before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 12/10/2021 at 11:00 AM. (Healey, Brendan)
December 7, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant NYP Holdings, Inc. by Brendan J. Healey (Healey, Brendan)
November 23, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vivek Shah as to NYP Holdings, Inc. on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Shah, Vivek)
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 MAILED Copyright Report to Registrar, Washington DC. (cp, )
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER from Vivek Shah received 11/22/2021 with Copyright information. (cp, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Telephone status hearing is set for 1/19/2022 at 9:15 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 COMPLAINT filed by Vivek Shah; Jury Demand. (Exhibits). (cp, )
November 18, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant NYP Holdings, Inc. (cp, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 MAILED Copyright Request Letter to Vivek Shah. (cp).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Vivek Shah. (cp).
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (cp).
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Vivek Shah. (Exhibits). (cp)
November 17, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cp, )
November 17, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shah v. NYP Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivek Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYP Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan J. Healey
Represented By: Sharon Renae Albrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Newspapers Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Daily News Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vox Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Smoking Gun, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E! Entertainment Television, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Atlantic Monthly Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Studios, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inside Edition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telepictures Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC News, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOX News Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?