Oakley, Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: Oakley, Inc.
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", QVISELD Store, Shop911061059 Store, Astros Store, zbs2021 Store, Sportic Gear Outdoor Store, bosshuangvv Store, QF77 Store, QG Outdoor Cycling Store, Innovative Fitness & Cycling Sporting Co,Ltd Store, outdoor legends store, Travel friend Store, xtong cycling Store, JUJULAI Professional Cycling Outdoor Store, ZHHS Outdoor Store, COOLPANDAS OUTDOOR Store, HS Outdoor Product Store, MeiLiRenSheng002 Store Store, Pais Glasses Store, Wenzhou Shine Optical Co., Ltd, LiNaKuaJing, moonuk, sweety2667 Store, sunshine706 Store, rbsunglasses Store, okfactory, daqiaoli Store, mystore01 Store, jewelrystore121 Store, dandelionI4 Store, xunkymax, kinglily, Future Online Brand, China Shoes Box, Heart Room, mkciacfv, yujing23521, yangwen44726 and ygqlakshdaui
Case Number: 1:2021cv06151
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 NEW PARTIES: QVISELD Store, Shop911061059 Store, Astros Store, zbs2021 Store, Sportic Gear Outdoor Store, bosshuangvv Store, QF77 Store, QG Outdoor Cycling Store, Innovative Fitness & Cycling Sporting Co,Ltd Store, outdoor legends store, Travel friend Store, xtong cycling Store, JUJULAI Professional Cycling Outdoor Store, ZHHS Outdoor Store, COOLPANDAS OUTDOOR Store, HS Outdoor Product Store, MeiLiRenSheng002 Store Store, Pais Glasses Store, Wenzhou Shine Optical Co., Ltd, LiNaKuaJing, moonuk, sweety2667 Store, sunshine706 Store, rbsunglasses Store, okfactory, daqiaoli Store, mystore01 Store, jewelrystore121 Store, dandelionI4 Store, xunkymax, kinglily, Future Online Brand, China Shoes Box, Heart Room, mkciacfv, yujing23521, yangwen44726 and ygqlakshdaui added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy)
December 29, 2021 Filing 35 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama on 12/29/2021. Mailed notice (axc).
December 29, 2021 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. On the grounds set forth in the motion, Plaintiff's motion for an entry of a preliminary injunction #30 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The following documents are to be unsealed: (1) Schedule A to the Complaint #2 ; (2) Exhibit 1 to the Complaint #3 ; (3) Exhibit 2 the Declaration of Jason Groppe #14 ; and (4) the Temporary Restraining Order #24 . Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd. is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days, instructions can be found in the attachment to this entry. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Add and Terminate Party) (axc).
December 27, 2021 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oakley, Inc. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 12/27/2021, answer due 1/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas J. Juettner)(Juettner, Thomas)
December 27, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE by Oakley, Inc. re MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for preliminary injunction #30 (Christensen, Jake)
December 27, 2021 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM by Oakley, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #30 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jake M. Christensen, #2 Exhibit 1)(Christensen, Jake)
December 27, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Christensen, Jake)
December 16, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (cxr, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 29 EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama on 12/14/2021. Mailed notice (axc).
December 14, 2021 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court hereby grants Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order #25 . The Temporary Restraining Order #24 shall now expire on December 30, 2021 at 6:00 p.m. Mailed notice (axc).
December 13, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE by Oakley, Inc. re memorandum in support of motion #26 (Christensen, Jake)
December 13, 2021 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by Oakley, Inc. in support of extension of time #25 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jake M. Christensen)(Christensen, Jake)
December 13, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Christensen, Jake)
December 3, 2021 TRO BOND in the amount of $ $10,000.00 posted by Oakley, Inc. (jj, )
November 30, 2021 Filing 24 SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama on 11/30/2021. Mailed notice (axc).
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. alleges claims of design patent infringement against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (collectively, Defendants). R. 1, Compl.; R. 2, Sched. A. Plaintiff's pending motion for leave to file under seal (R. #4 ), ex parte motion for a temporary restraining order (R. #10 ), and motion for electronic service of process (R. #15 ) are hereby granted. Provided that Plaintiff provides the security described in paragraph 10 of the temporary restraining order, the temporary restraining order shall become effective on December 2, 2021 at 6:00 p.m. and shall expire in fourteen (14) days from the effective date. Signed by the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama on 11/30/2021. Mailed notice (axc)
November 23, 2021 Filing 22 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (gcy, )
November 22, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Claims Involving Patents by Oakley, Inc. (Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Oakley, Inc. (Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by Oakley, Inc. re MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) #15 , MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for temporary restraining order Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery #10 , MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for leave to file under seal #4 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Oakley, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Oakley, Inc. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #15 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 14 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. Exhibit 2 regarding declaration #13 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Jason Groppe regarding memorandum in support of motion #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by Oakley, Inc. in support of motion for temporary restraining order #10 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for temporary restraining order Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. by Thomas Joseph Juettner (Juettner, Thomas)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. Exhibit 1 regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Oakley, Inc.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18884627. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 17, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jf, )
November 17, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakley, Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakley, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Jake Michael Christensen
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Juettner
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QVISELD Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop911061059 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astros Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zbs2021 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sportic Gear Outdoor Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bosshuangvv Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QF77 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QG Outdoor Cycling Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Fitness & Cycling Sporting Co,Ltd Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: outdoor legends store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travel friend Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xtong cycling Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUJULAI Professional Cycling Outdoor Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZHHS Outdoor Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOLPANDAS OUTDOOR Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HS Outdoor Product Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MeiLiRenSheng002 Store Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pais Glasses Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wenzhou Shine Optical Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LiNaKuaJing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: moonuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sweety2667 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sunshine706 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rbsunglasses Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: okfactory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: daqiaoli Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mystore01 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jewelrystore121 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dandelionI4 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xunkymax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kinglily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future Online Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Shoes Box
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heart Room
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mkciacfv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yujing23521
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yangwen44726
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ygqlakshdaui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?