Richemont International SA et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: Richemont International SA, Cartier International A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Chloe S.A.S., Van Cleef & Arpels SA and Officine Panerai A.G.
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Case Number: 1:2021cv06160
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiff's motion for an extension of the TRO (Dckt. No. #24 ) is hereby granted. The Court extends the TRO until January 31, 2022. As previously ordered, the summary of frozen funds is due by February 7, 2022. Mailed notice (jjr, )
January 13, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (cxr, )
January 12, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiffs Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA, Van Cleef & Arpels SA for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allyson M. Martin)(Martin, Allyson)
January 3, 2022 Filing 23 SEALED TEMPORARY Restraining Order Signed by the Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 1/3/2022. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
January 3, 2022 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal (Dckt. No. #3 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (Dckt. No. #11 ) is hereby granted. Temporary Restraining Order to follow. Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process (Dckt. No. #17 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff must file a summary of frozen funds by February 7, 2022. Mailed notice (jjr, )
November 22, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA, Van Cleef & Arpels SA (Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA, Van Cleef & Arpels SA (Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA, Van Cleef & Arpels SA in support of motion for miscellaneous relief, #17 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiffs Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA, Van Cleef & Arpels SA for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 16 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA, Van Cleef & Arpels SA Exhibit 22 regarding declaration, #14 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 15 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA, Van Cleef & Arpels SA Exhibit 21 Parts 1-5 regarding declaration, #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21-1, #2 Exhibit 21-2, #3 Exhibit 21-3, #4 Exhibit 21-4, #5 Exhibit 21-5)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Emma-Jane Tritton regarding memorandum in support of motion #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA, Van Cleef & Arpels SA in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #11 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiffs Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA, Van Cleef & Arpels SA for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials(jg, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jg, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA, Van Cleef & Arpels SA by Abby Marie Neu (Neu, Abby)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA, Van Cleef & Arpels SA by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA, Van Cleef & Arpels SA by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA, Van Cleef & Arpels SA by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION by Plaintiffs Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA, Van Cleef & Arpels SA for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA, Van Cleef & Arpels SA Schedule A regarding complaint, #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA, Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Cartier International A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18885320. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 17, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ak, )
November 17, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richemont International SA et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richemont International SA
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Abby Marie Neu
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cartier International A.G.
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Abby Marie Neu
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montblanc-Simplo GMBH
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Abby Marie Neu
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chloe S.A.S.
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Abby Marie Neu
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Cleef & Arpels SA
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Abby Marie Neu
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Officine Panerai A.G.
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Abby Marie Neu
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?