Oakley, Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: Oakley, Inc.
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", ZRG bike Store, Goodbuena Store, Fishing Profession Store, Sunglasses factory1201 Store, Runningfree Store, Cycling Shop Store, Jeowak Online Store, MCFK Official Store, Shop912220388 Store, 100% Outdoor supplies Store, A1JDJAI65MMDXT, ZYZK, Ymioo, yinuokejigongsi, Hong Lai Business, towork Store, pilgrim001 Store, wuchaoqun520 Store, loungersofa Store, ftiier Store, jersey Mike's Store, zlh19900104 Store, brand_sneaker Store, messi666 Store, yyangzi Store, xyfz6 Store, KING2020, hewei3920 and sunxuping1519
Case Number: 1:2021cv06161
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 NEW PARTIES: ZRG bike Store, Goodbuena Store, Fishing Profession Store, Sunglasses factory1201 Store, Runningfree Store, Cycling Shop Store, Jeowak Online Store, MCFK Official Store, Shop912220388 Store, 100% Outdoor supplies Store, A1JDJAI65MMDXT, ZYZK, Ymioo, yinuokejigongsi, Hong Lai Business, towork Store, pilgrim001 Store, wuchaoqun520 Store, loungersofa Store, ftiier Store, jersey Mike's Store, zlh19900104 Store, brand_sneaker Store, messi666 Store, yyangzi Store, xyfz6 Store, KING2020, hewei3920 and sunxuping1519 added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy)
January 5, 2022 Filing 36 PRELIMINARY Injunction Order. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/5/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
January 5, 2022 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held by telephone on 1/5/2022. No one was present on behalf of defendants. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction #29 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The Clerk's office is directed to unseal the Schedule A to the Complaint #2 , Exhibit 1 to the Complaint #3 , Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Jason Groppe #15 , and the TRO #23 . Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website www.ilnd.uscourts.com/instructions. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
January 3, 2022 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone hearing as to the motion for preliminary injunction #29 is set for 1/5/2022 at 9:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 33 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (gcy, ) (Main Document 33 PDF Corrected on 12/29/2021) (gcy, ).
December 27, 2021 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oakley, Inc. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 12/27/2021, answer due 1/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas J. Juettner)(Juettner, Thomas)
December 27, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE by Oakley, Inc. re MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for preliminary injunction #29 (Christensen, Jake)
December 27, 2021 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM by Oakley, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #29 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jake M. Christensen, #2 Exhibit 1)(Christensen, Jake)
December 27, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Christensen, Jake)
December 16, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (cxr, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiff's ex parte motion to extend the temporary restraining order #25 is granted. The Temporary Restraining Order entered on 12/2/2021 #23 is extended by a period of fourteen (14) days until 12/30/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE by Oakley, Inc. re MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order #25 (Christensen, Jake)
December 14, 2021 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by Oakley, Inc. in support of extension of time #25 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jake M. Christensen)(Christensen, Jake)
December 14, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Christensen, Jake)
December 10, 2021 Filing 24 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by Oakley, Inc. (Document not scanned). (jg, )
December 2, 2021 Filing 23 SEALED Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/2/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 2, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery #11 is granted. Enter TRO. Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) #16 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 24, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Claims Involving Patents by Oakley, Inc. (Gaudio, Justin)
November 24, 2021 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Oakley, Inc. (Gaudio, Justin)
November 24, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by Oakley, Inc. re MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for temporary restraining order Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery #11 , MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) #16 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 24, 2021 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 24, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Oakley, Inc. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #16 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 24, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
November 24, 2021 Filing 15 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. Exhibit 2 regarding declaration #14 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 1/6/2022 (lma, ).
November 24, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Jason Groppe regarding memorandum in support of motion #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 24, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 24, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Oakley, Inc. in support of motion for temporary restraining order #11 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for temporary restraining order Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for leave to file under seal #4 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 18, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )
November 18, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mxo, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. by Thomas Joseph Juettner (Juettner, Thomas)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. Exhibit 1 regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Oakley, Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Oakley, Inc.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18885778. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5)(Gaudio, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakley, Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakley, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Jake Michael Christensen
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Juettner
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZRG bike Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodbuena Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fishing Profession Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunglasses factory1201 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Runningfree Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cycling Shop Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeowak Online Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCFK Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop912220388 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 100% Outdoor supplies Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A1JDJAI65MMDXT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYZK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ymioo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yinuokejigongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Lai Business
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: towork Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pilgrim001 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wuchaoqun520 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: loungersofa Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ftiier Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jersey Mike's Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zlh19900104 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: brand_sneaker Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: messi666 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yyangzi Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xyfz6 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KING2020
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hewei3920
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sunxuping1519
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?