Felgenhauer et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eric Felgenhauer and Deanna Felgenhauer
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, d/b/a "Mr. Cooper", McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC doing business as "Mr. Cooper"
Case Number: 1:2021cv06163
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant Nationstar's Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #6 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 1/28/2022. Motion hearing set for 1/11/2022 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Caleb J. Halberg for presentment of extension of time #6 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 1/11/2022 at 09:00 AM. (Halberg, Caleb)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Unopposed) (Halberg, Caleb)
December 14, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC by Caleb J. Halberg (Halberg, Caleb)
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Felgenhauer, Deanna Felgenhauer as to Nationstar Mortgage, LLC on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021. (Payton, Rusty)
December 7, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 2/28/2022 at 9:15 a.m. which will proceed via Teleconference. Joint Status Report due by 2/23/2022. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Teleconference instructions are as follows: Prior to the conference call, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
December 1, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (jmk, )
November 18, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )
November 18, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mxo, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Deanna Felgenhauer, Eric Felgenhauer by Rusty A. Payton (Payton, Rusty)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Eric Felgenhauer, Deanna Felgenhauer; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18885970. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Loan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Emails re Loss Mit Application, #3 Exhibit 3 - Motion for Judgment of FC and Sale, #4 Exhibit 4 - Judgment for FC and Sale, #5 Exhibit 5 - Motion to Vacate, #6 Exhibit 6 - Response to Motion to Vacate, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice of Error, #8 Exhibit 8 - 2021.11.02 FC Order, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Payton, Rusty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felgenhauer et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Felgenhauer
Represented By: Rusty A. Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Felgenhauer
Represented By: Rusty A. Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, d/b/a "Mr. Cooper"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC doing business as "Mr. Cooper"
Represented By: Caleb J. Halberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?