Tolve v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Lorena Tolve
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv06175
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Referring Judge: Sunil R Harjani
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Haile, Jonathan)
January 6, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Harjani for all further proceedings. Defendant shall file the administrative record by 1/17/2022. By 5/16/2022, Defendant shall submit a courtesy copy of the administrative record to Judge Harjani's chambers (Room 1870). Pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision is due by 3/18/2022; Defendant's motion to affirm the decision and her brief in support are due by 5/2/2022; and Plaintiff's reply brief is due by 5/16/2022. The parties must include in their briefs a list of the questions presented in support of remand or affirmance. Stating simply that the ALJ's decision is or is not supported by substantial evidence is not sufficient. No oversized briefs will be allowed without prior court approval obtained at least one week prior to the due date and upon good cause shown. Mailed notice (cc, )
January 6, 2022 Filing 11 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani for all further proceedings. Honorable Maria Valdez no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/6/2021. (ph, )
December 1, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: This matter has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maria Valdez for ruling on final disposition of this case. The briefing schedule previously set by the District Judge shall stand. Mailed notice (lp, )
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Maria Valdez, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Thomas M. Durkin no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/1/2021. (ph, )
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The parties have consented to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. This case will be sent to the Executive Committee for reassignment. All pending dates before this Court are stricken. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 1, 2021 Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
November 26, 2021 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Jonathan C. Haile as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Haile, Jonathan)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. The Court finds that Plaintiff is unable to pay the costs and fees associated with filing this action and thus the filing fee is waived. This matter is before the Court for review of a final decision by the Commissioner of Social Security. The parties should consult with each other by 12/2/2021 to determine whether they will consent to the reassignment of this case to the magistrate judge for all further proceedings. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge, they should file a joint statement of consent pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(a). Otherwise, pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, Plaintiff shall file a brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review within 60 days after the filing of the answer to the complaint and/or the administrative record. Within 45 days thereafter, the Commissioner shall file its motion to affirm the decision subject to review and its brief in support. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days thereafter. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Lorena Tolve for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Marvin, Cody)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lorena Tolve by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Lorena Tolve; (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)
November 18, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )
November 18, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mxo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolve v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorena Tolve
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Jonathan C. Haile
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?