Firestone Financial, LLC v. Kljajic et al
Plaintiff: Firestone Financial, LLC
Defendant: Ognjen Kljajic, Ogy Kljajic, Strong One Freight, LLC, Right Logistics Incorporated and Marko Desnica
Case Number: 1:2021cv06184
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Firestone Financial, LLC as to Ognjen Kljajic on 12/20/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Ramos, Joseph)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 2/23/2022 at 09:45 AM (to track the case only; no appearance required). Joint Rule 26(f) planning report due 2/14/2022. (The form of the report can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.) The court will set a schedule based on the report. Mailed notice (reg)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Firestone Financial, LLC by Joseph Ramos (Ramos, Joseph)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Firestone Financial, LLC by David Alexander Darcy (Darcy, David)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Firestone Financial, LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18888943. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Darcy, David)
November 18, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jmk, )
November 18, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jmk, )
November 18, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Marko Desnica, Ognjen Kljajic, Right Logistics Incorporated, Strong One Freight, LLC (sxh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firestone Financial, LLC v. Kljajic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ognjen Kljajic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogy Kljajic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strong One Freight, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Right Logistics Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marko Desnica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firestone Financial, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Ramos
Represented By: David Alexander Darcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?