January 5, 2022 |
Filing 17
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mohammed Mahran. Cook County Pharmacy Association, Chicago Joint Board, Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, AFL-CIO-CLC Local 200 (Pharmacists and Pharmacy Technicians) waiver sent on 1/4/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Custardo, Matthew)
|
January 4, 2022 |
Filing 16
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendants' motions for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #14 #15 are granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 3/7/22. The deadline of 2/7/22 for parties to file a joint initial status report #6 is re-set to 3/28/22. Mailed notice. (dm, )
|
January 3, 2022 |
Filing 15
MOTION by Defendant Cook County Pharmacy Association, Chicago Joint Board, Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, AFL-CIO-CLC Local 200 (Pharmacists and Pharmacy Technicians) for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Seltzer, Robert)
|
January 3, 2022 |
Filing 14
MOTION by Defendants Cook County, Cook County Health and Hospital System for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 or otherwise plead until March 5, 2022 (Gregory, Kristina)
|
January 3, 2022 |
Filing 13
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed Mahran (Custardo, Matthew)
|
January 3, 2022 |
Filing 12
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed Mahran (Custardo, Matthew)
|
January 3, 2022 |
Filing 11
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed Mahran as to Cook County Pharmacy Association, Chicago Joint Board, Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, AFL-CIO-CLC Local 200 (Pharmacists and Pharmacy Technicians) on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Custardo, Matthew)
|
January 3, 2022 |
Filing 10
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed Mahran as to Cook County Health and Hospital System on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Custardo, Matthew)
|
January 3, 2022 |
Filing 9
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed Mahran as to Cook County on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Custardo, Matthew)
|
December 31, 2021 |
Filing 8
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cook County Pharmacy Association, Chicago Joint Board, Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, AFL-CIO-CLC Local 200 (Pharmacists and Pharmacy Technicians) by Robert A. Seltzer (Seltzer, Robert)
|
December 29, 2021 |
Filing 7
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cook County, Cook County Health and Hospital System by Kristina Marie Gregory (Gregory, Kristina)
|
December 6, 2021 |
Filing 6
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 2/7/22, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
|
December 3, 2021 |
Filing 5
SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Mohammed Mahran as to Cook County Health and Hospital System. (Custardo, Matthew)
|
December 3, 2021 |
Filing 4
SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Mohammed Mahran as to Cook County. (Custardo, Matthew)
|
December 3, 2021 |
Filing 3
SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Mohammed Mahran as to Cook County Pharmacy Association, Chicago Joint Board, Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, AFL-CIO-CLC Local 200 (Pharmacists and Pharmacy Technicians). (Custardo, Matthew)
|
November 29, 2021 |
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )
|
November 29, 2021 |
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached
|
November 24, 2021 |
Filing 2
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mohammed Mahran by Matthew Ryan Custardo (Custardo, Matthew)
|
November 24, 2021 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT filed by Mohammed Mahran; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18909127. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Custardo, Matthew)
|