Gamboa v. The Procter & Gamble Company
Plaintiff: Jan Gamboa
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv06515
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Telephone motion hearing held. Any response to the motion to transfer case #15 is due by 3/9/2022; reply by 4/6/2022. Motion to extend time #18 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint within 30 days after ruling on the motion to transfer. The status hearing set for 2/16/2022 is stricken and will be reset at a later date. Mailed notice (ags)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company by Raseq Moizuddin (Moizuddin, Raseq)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Defendant's NOTICE of Motion by Jody Kahn Mason for presentment of extension of time #18 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 2/2/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Mason, Jody)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Defendant's NOTICE of Motion by Jody Kahn Mason for presentment of motion to transfer case #15 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 2/2/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Mason, Jody)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company for hearing re MOTION by Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company for extension of time Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time Pending Transfer #18 Defendant's Notice Of Motion for Its Motion for Enlargement of Time Pending Transfer (Mason, Jody) Modified on 1/27/2022 to correct type of filing (ags).
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company for extension of time Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time Pending Transfer (Mason, Jody)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by The Procter & Gamble Company Defendant's Memorandum of Law In Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration of Ingo Vetter)(Mason, Jody)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company for hearing re MOTION by Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company to transfer case Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue #15 Defendant's Notice of Motion for Its Motion To Transfer Venue (Mason, Jody) Modified on 1/27/2022 to correct type of filing (ags).
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company to transfer case Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue (Mason, Jody)
January 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion for extension of time #11 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 1/26/2022. The status hearing set for 1/25/2022 is stricken and reset to 2/16/2022 at 9:30 a.m. Motion hearing date is stricken. Remote access remains the same as in entry #5 . Mailed notice (ags)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Jody Kahn Mason for presentment of extension of time #11 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/19/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Mason, Jody)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Jody Kahn Mason for presentment of extension of time #11 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/12/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Mason, Jody)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company for extension of time DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (Mason, Jody)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion for extension of time #9 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 1/12/2022. Mailed notice (ags)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company for extension of time DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (Mason, Jody)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jan Gamboa by David Louis Gerbie (Gerbie, David)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jan Gamboa by Steven Russell Beckham (Beckham, Steven)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel, Steven Russell Beckham. (jh, )
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Initial status hearing is set for 1/25/2022 at 11:00 a.m. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (877) 402-9753 and the access code is 1564342. Counsel of record will receive an email the day before the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (ags)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jh, )
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company by Jessica Eunseon Chang (Chang, Jessica)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Procter & Gamble Company by Jody Kahn Mason (Mason, Jody)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mason, Jody)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois - County Department Chancery Division, case number (2021CH05459) filed by The Procter & Gamble Company Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18939339. (Mason, Jody)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamboa v. The Procter & Gamble Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Gamboa
Represented By: David Louis Gerbie
Represented By: Steven Russell Beckham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Represented By: Jody Kahn Mason
Represented By: Jessica Eunseon Chang
Represented By: Raseq Moizuddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?