Qualls v. Anong LLC dba Availblue et al
Plaintiff: Tyanna Qualls and John Does 1-10
Defendant: Anong LLC dba Availblue, LDF Holdings, LLC, Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo, Mark Koetting, Mainspring Management, LLC, Rick A. Gwynne II, Anong LLC doing business as Availblue, Jessi Phillips Lorenzo and Jessi Lee Phillips
Case Number: 1:2021cv06598
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants Anong LLC, LDF Holdings, LLC, Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo for extension of time to file response/reply as to complaint #1 (Lamer, Bryant)
February 2, 2022 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Anong LLC, LDF Holdings, LLC, Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo by Bryant Todd Lamer (Lamer, Bryant)
January 24, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyanna Qualls as to Anong LLC on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
January 21, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyanna Qualls as to LDF Holdings, LLC on 1/13/2022, answer due 2/3/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
January 21, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyanna Qualls as to Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo on 1/13/2022, answer due 2/3/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
January 13, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendants' motion for extension of time to respond to complaint #9 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 2/10/2022. Defendants are reminded that all requests for extensions of time should indicate whether any other party objects to the extension. Mailed notice (dal, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Rick A. Gwynne II, Mark Koetting, Mainspring Management, LLC by Eric D Kaplan (Kaplan, Eric)
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants Rick A. Gwynne II, Mark Koetting, Mainspring Management, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Wunder, Christopher)
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Rick A. Gwynne II, Mark Koetting, Mainspring Management, LLC by Christopher S. Wunder (Wunder, Christopher)
December 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyanna Qualls as to Mainspring Management, LLC on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyanna Qualls as to Mark Koetting on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 13, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Anong LLC, Rick A. Gwynne II, Mark Koetting, LDF Holdings, LLC, Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo, Mainspring Management, LLC (dxb, )
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic initial status hearing set for 2/15/2022 at 10:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, )
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tyanna Qualls by Matthew J. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 9, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tyanna Qualls by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
December 9, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tyanna Qualls by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
December 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION filed by Tyanna Qualls; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18953417. (Attachments: #1 Appendix (A-M), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelman, Daniel)
December 9, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )
December 9, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lxk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qualls v. Anong LLC dba Availblue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyanna Qualls
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anong LLC dba Availblue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LDF Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Koetting
Represented By: Eric D Kaplan
Represented By: Christopher S. Wunder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainspring Management, LLC
Represented By: Eric D Kaplan
Represented By: Christopher S. Wunder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick A. Gwynne II
Represented By: Eric D Kaplan
Represented By: Christopher S. Wunder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anong LLC doing business as Availblue
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessi Phillips Lorenzo
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessi Lee Phillips
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?