Woods v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Veronica S. Woods
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv06603
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Referring Judge: Gabriel A Fuentes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: The Administrative Record having been filed on 2/04/22 (doc. #10 ), we set the following schedule for briefing cross motions for summary judgment: plaintiff's motion and memorandum are to be filed by no later than 5:00 p.m. on 4/05/22; defendant's cross motion and memorandum are to be filed by no later than 5:00 p.m. on 5/20/22; and plaintiff's reply is to be filed by no later than 5:00 p.m. on 6/03/22. Please note that no oversized briefs will be allowed without prior court approval obtained at least one week before the due date and upon good cause shown. Mailed notice. (jj, )
February 4, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Claus, Michael)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: The case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Fuentes on consent (doc. #8 ). In accordance with Local Rule 16.4, after the filing of the Administrative Record, the Court will set a briefing schedule. The parties are directed to review and comply with Judge Fuentes' standing orders for filing motions and/or proposed orders, which are available on Judge Fuentes' webpage located on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Please note that no oversized briefs will be allowed without prior court approval obtained at least one week before the due date and upon good cause shown. Mailed notice (dal, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment Honorable Edmond E. Chang no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 12/20/2021. (ph, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the in forma pauperis application #4 , the application is granted in light of financial indigency. The parties have filed a joint consent to the magistrate judge's jurisdiction, R. 6, which will be processed with the Executive Committee. Mailed notice. (kp, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
December 14, 2021 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Michael D. Claus as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Claus, Michael)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Veronica S. Woods for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Marvin, Cody)
December 10, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Veronica S. Woods by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT filed by Veronica S. Woods; (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody) Modified on 12/13/2021 (aee, ).
December 10, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
December 10, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (dxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica S. Woods
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Michael D. Claus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?