February 1, 2022 |
Filing 13
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff's unopposed motion to reset the status report and status hearing dates #12 is granted. The status report and status hearing dates of 2/1/22 and 2/9/22 are stricken. The parties shall file a joint written status report on 3/22/22. Status hearing set for 3/29/22. (ca, )
|
January 31, 2022 |
Filing 12
MOTION by Plaintiff Phillip Robinson to reset Initial Status Hearing (Unopposed) (Heckel, Madison)
|
January 28, 2022 |
Filing 11
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Defendants' motion for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading #10 is granted. The new deadline for Defendants' answer or responsive pleading is now 3/16/22. (ca, )
|
January 26, 2022 |
Filing 10
MOTION by Defendants Alejandro Cabral, City of Chicago, Kevin Gomez, Andrius Tkachuk for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead UNOPPOSED (Perrone, Nicholas)
|
January 26, 2022 |
Filing 9
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Alejandro Cabral, City of Chicago, Kevin Gomez, Andrius Tkachuk by Nicholas John Perrone (Perrone, Nicholas)
|
January 25, 2022 |
Filing 8
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Phillip Robinson. City of Chicago waiver sent on 12/17/2021, answer due 2/15/2022. (Barney, Ian)
|
January 24, 2022 |
Filing 7
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Robinson as to Andrius Tkachuk on 1/11/2022, answer due 2/1/2022. (Heckel, Madison)
|
January 24, 2022 |
Filing 6
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Robinson as to Kevin Gomez on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (Heckel, Madison)
|
January 24, 2022 |
Filing 5
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Robinson as to Alejandro Cabral on 1/8/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Heckel, Madison)
|
January 12, 2022 |
Filing 4
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Phillip Robinson by Madison Noelle Heckel (Heckel, Madison)
|
December 20, 2021 |
Filing 3
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 2/9/22 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 2/1/22. The report should comply with the requirements for initial joint status reports set forth in the Initial Status Conference standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw== (ca, )
|
December 17, 2021 |
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Alejandro Cabral, Kevin Gomez, Andrius Tkachuk, Patryk Urbanek (cxr, )
|
December 16, 2021 |
Filing 2
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Phillip Robinson by Ian Matthew Barney (Barney, Ian)
|
December 16, 2021 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT filed by Phillip Robinson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18977615. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barney, Ian)
|
December 16, 2021 |
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached
|
December 16, 2021 |
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )
|