Doe v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Case Number: 1:2021cv06713
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Doe for Defendants Chenghz world and ZMHM KING (Beymer, Brandon)
January 28, 2022 Filing 30 SURETY BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 posted by plaintiff John Doe (Document not scanned). (exr, )
January 25, 2022 Filing 29 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order. Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 1/25/2022. Mailed notice. (kp, )
January 25, 2022 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Telephonic motion hearing held on 1/25/2022 regarding motion for preliminary injunction #25 . Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #25 is granted. Enter Order. Status hearing set for 3/10/2022 at 10:00 a.m. This hearing may be converted into a default judgment hearing, if plaintiff is ready and provides timely notice of its intent to all defendants. The Clerk is directed to unseal all documents that were previously filed under seal. Law Firm Saper Law Offices, LLC is ordered to add all defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov /_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. The hearing will be via telephone conference. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 1246152. Counsel of record will receive an email the day before the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (kp, )
January 24, 2022 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing set for 1/25/2022 at 10:00 a.m. as to the Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #25 . The hearing will be via telephone conference. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 1246152. Counsel of record will receive an email the day before the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (kp, )
January 21, 2022 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by John Doe in support of motion for preliminary injunction #25 (Beymer, Brandon)
January 21, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe for preliminary injunction (Beymer, Brandon)
January 21, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (ak, )
January 11, 2022 Filing 24 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (ph, )
January 11, 2022 Filing 23 MAILED (Sealed) Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (ph, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 22 (SEALED) LETTER returned from Brandon Beymer regarding trademark request. (ph, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 21 EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 1/10/2022. Mailed notice. (kp, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff's ex parte motion to extend the temporary restraining order by a period of fourteen (14) days until January 24, 2022 #19 is granted. Mailed notice. (kp, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe for extension of time to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Beymer, Brandon)
December 27, 2021 Filing 18 SEALED TEMPORARY Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/27/2021. Mailed notice. (kp, )
December 27, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #13 is granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery #8 is granted. Plaintiffs' motion for electronic service of process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) #11 is granted. Mailed notice. (kp, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John Doe by Daliah Saper (Saper, Daliah)
December 17, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ng, )
December 17, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
December 16, 2021 Filing 15 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Saper, Daliah)
December 16, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John Doe by Brandon Matthew Beymer (Beymer, Brandon)
December 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe to seal document sealed document #4 , sealed document #2 , sealed document #3 , sealed document #7 , sealed document #9 , sealed document, #10 , sealed document #5 , sealed document #8 (Beymer, Brandon)
December 16, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by John Doe in support of motion for service by publication #11 (Beymer, Brandon)
December 16, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe for service by publication (Beymer, Brandon)
December 16, 2021 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Declaration of Plaintiff in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4D)(Beymer, Brandon)
December 16, 2021 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Beymer, Brandon)
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Beymer, Brandon)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Local Rule 3.4 Notice of Trademark Claim (Beymer, Brandon)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 Local Rule 3.2 Statement STATEMENT by John Doe (Beymer, Brandon)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Schedule A)(Beymer, Brandon)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Schedule A to Complaint (Beymer, Brandon)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 2 to Complaint (Beymer, Brandon)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 1 to Complaint (Beymer, Brandon)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John Doe; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18977881. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Beymer, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Beymer
Represented By: Daliah Saper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?