American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries v. National Institute of Pension Administrators
Plaintiff: American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries doing business as American Retirement Association
Defendant: National Institute of Pension Administrators
Case Number: 1:2021cv06754
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Naresh Kilaru's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #18 is granted. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 16, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19163144. (Kilaru, Naresh)
February 16, 2022 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Mark Sommers and Rosie Norwood-Kelly's motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #15 and #16 are granted. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 16, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19161136. (Norwood-Kelly, Rosie)
February 16, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19161101. (Sommers, Mark)
February 14, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On 12/23/21, this Court ordered the parties to file a status report by 2/7/22, see #9 , but they failed to do so. The Court hereby extends the deadline to 2/28/22. If the parties fail to file a status report by this deadline, the Court may dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 1, 2022 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Institute of Pension Administrators by Samuel John Erkonen (Erkonen, Samuel)
February 1, 2022 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Institute of Pension Administrators by Samuel John Erkonen (Erkonen, Samuel)
February 1, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Institute of Pension Administrators by Samuel John Erkonen (Erkonen, Samuel)
February 1, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by National Institute of Pension Administrators(Erkonen, Samuel)
December 23, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 2/7/2022, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries as to National Institute of Pension Administrators on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Murray, Lynn)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (rc, )
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 MAILED (Patent or Trademark) Request Letter to Plaintiff's counsel Yara Khaled Rashad. (rc, )
December 21, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant National Institute of Pension Administrators (ak, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries (Murray, Lynn)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries by Yara Khaled Rashad (Rashad, Yara)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries by Lynn Hagman Murray (Murray, Lynn)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Murray, Lynn)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18984977.(Murray, Lynn)
December 20, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (dxb, )
December 20, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries v. National Institute of Pension Administrators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries doing business as American Retirement Association
Represented By: Yara Khaled Rashad
Represented By: Lynn Hagman Murray
Represented By: Mark Stuart Sommers
Represented By: Naresh Kilaru
Represented By: Rosie Norwood-Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Institute of Pension Administrators
Represented By: Samuel John Erkonen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?