VITAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., d/b/a VPX Sports v. Berlin Packaging LLC
Plaintiff: VITAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., d/b/a VPX Sports and Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as VPX Sports
Defendant: Berlin Packaging LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv06866
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Berlin Packaging LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #17 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael A. Skokna, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Skokna, Michael)
February 23, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Berlin Packaging LLC (Skokna, Michael)
February 11, 2022 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint #15 , which is its one amendment of right under Civil Rule 15(a)(1). Motion to dismiss #10 and motion to enter scheduling order #14 are denied as moot. The motion hearing set for 3/11/2022 #13 is stricken. There is no need to file a joint status report on 2/23/2022.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 9, 2022 Filing 15 AMENDED complaint by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. against Berlin Packaging LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement, #2 Exhibit Terms and Conditions)(Crabb, Michael)
January 26, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Berlin Packaging LLC to Enter Scheduling Order (JOINT) (Skokna, Michael)
January 20, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to file and for protective order #9 is granted. Defendant may file under seal the designated materials, so long as it publicly files a redacted version of those materials. Motion to dismiss #10 is entered and continued. Motion hearing set for 3/11/2022 at 10:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 19, 2022 Filing 12 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Berlin Packaging LLC (Exhibit E) regarding memorandum in support of motion, #11 (Skokna, Michael)
January 19, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by Berlin Packaging LLC in support of motion to dismiss, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #10 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E - Redacted)(Skokna, Michael)
January 19, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Berlin Packaging LLC to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Berlin Packaging LLC (Skokna, Michael)
January 19, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Berlin Packaging LLC for leave to file Unredacted Document Under Seal, MOTION by Defendant Berlin Packaging LLC for protective order (Skokna, Michael)
January 19, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Berlin Packaging LLC by Joseph Becker (Becker, Joseph)
January 19, 2022 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Berlin Packaging LLC (Skokna, Michael)
January 19, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Berlin Packaging LLC by Michael Anthony Skokna (Skokna, Michael)
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 3/2/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 2/23/2022. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. as to Berlin Packaging LLC on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022. (Crabb, Michael)
December 28, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Berlin Packaging LLC (jj, )
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by VITAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., d/b/a VPX Sports (Crabb, Michael)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff VITAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., d/b/a VPX Sports by Michael T Crabb (Crabb, Michael)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by VITAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., d/b/a VPX Sports; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19000591. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement, #2 Exhibit Terms and Conditions, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crabb, Michael)
December 27, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ak, )
December 27, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VITAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., d/b/a VPX Sports v. Berlin Packaging LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VITAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., d/b/a VPX Sports
Represented By: Michael T Crabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as VPX Sports
Represented By: Michael T Crabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berlin Packaging LLC
Represented By: Michael Anthony Skokna
Represented By: Joseph Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?