Phamatech Incorporated v. Walgreen, Co. et al
Defendant: Does 1-10
Counter Defendant: Phamatech Incorporated
Counter Claimant: Walgreen Co
Case Number: 1:2021cv06886
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Heather K McShain
Referring Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Dwayne H. Stein's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff Phamatech Incorporated #26 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 2/18/2022: Mailed notice(daj, )
February 18, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19172792. (Stein, Dwayne)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Jeffrey N. Williams's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Walgreen Co. #24 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 2/1/2022: Mailed notice(daj, )
February 1, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19110531. (Williams, Jeffrey)
January 21, 2022 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Phamatech Incorporated, Counter Defendant Phamatech Incorporated by Dennis F. Esford (Esford, Dennis)
January 21, 2022 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Heather K. McShain: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge McShain for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision and scheduling, to set a deadline to file amended pleadings, to set a dispositive motions schedule, and for settlement #21 . The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report #20 and adopts the parties' proposed discovery schedule as follows: Rule 26(a) disclosures by 01/21/2022; fact discovery to be completed by 08/31/2022; expert disclosures (to include expert reports) by 10/29/2022; rebuttal expert reports by 11/23/2022; and expert discovery to be completed by 12/23/2022. Joint status report due on 03/25/2022 to update the Court on: (a) the progress of fact discovery; (b) the status of settlement discussions, if any; and (c) any other matters the parties wish to raise with the Court. The parties should be mindful that, notwithstanding any preference to take depositions in person, they cannot expect this in the current environment, nor can they reasonably expect the case to be put on hold until that changes. To be more specific, the parties are to assume that all depositions will have to be taken by remote means (unless both sides and the witness consent to an in-person deposition) and are to plan accordingly. Delay due to a desire to take in-person depositions at a later date will not be a basis for extending any discovery deadline beyond the current deadline. The parties may contact chambers at any time (by email to Chambers_McShain@ilnd.uscourts.gov) if they would like the Court's assistance with settlement. Mailed notice. (pk, )
January 19, 2022 Filing 21 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Heather K. McShain for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision and scheduling, to set a deadline to file amended pleadings, to set a dispositive motions schedule, and for settlement. (rao, )
January 18, 2022 Filing 20 STATUS Report (Joint Initial) by Walgreen Co (Carmichael, Christopher)
January 11, 2022 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Walgreen Co (Carmichael, Christopher)
January 11, 2022 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 1/18/2022. (rao, )
January 11, 2022 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walgreen Co by Christopher W Carmichael (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Affiliates)(Carmichael, Christopher)
December 28, 2021 Filing 16 MAILED Rule 83.15 to all counsel of record. (gcy, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 15 RECEIVED from California Southern; Case Number 3:21-cv-01234 (gcy)
December 28, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gcy, )
December 28, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (gcy, )
December 23, 2021 Filing 14 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Illinois. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Northern District of Illinois*.*219 S. Dearborn Street**Chicago, IL 60604*. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (sjt) [Transferred from California Southern on 12/28/2021.]
December 21, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Walgreen, Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - General Trade Agreement, #2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Jeffrey) **QC mailer re: wrong event (event corrected to motion to change venue) and reminder not to file proposed orders on docket (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/28/2021.]
December 16, 2021 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks: Telephonic attorneys-only settlement conference held on 12/16/2021. (Plaintiff Attorney Dwayne H. Stein). (Defendant Attorney Jeffrey N. Williams). (no document attached) (cdc) [Transferred from California Southern on 12/28/2021.]
December 8, 2021 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks: An Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference were held on December 7, 2021. (Plaintiff Attorney Dwayne H. Stein). (Defendant Attorneys Jeffrey N. Williams, Taylor E. Pernini). A telephonic attorneys-only settlement conference is set for December 16, 2021, at 8:00 a.m. Counsel shall participate in the conference by dialing in to the Court's teleconference line (877-336-1829, access code 1944316). The parties' stipulation to transfer this matter to the United States District Court, Northern District of Illinois is to be filed by December 21, 2021. The deadline for initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1)(A-E) is continued from December 21, 2021, to January 21, 2022. (no document attached) (cdc) [Transferred from California Southern on 12/28/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Following Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Setting Rule 26 Compliance. Joint Discovery Plan due 11/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 10/6/2021.(jrm) [Transferred from California Southern on 12/28/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks: An Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference were held by Zoom. (Plaintiff Attorney Dwayne H. Stein). (Defendant Attorneys Jeffrey N. Williams, Taylor E. Pernini). As discussed, the parties are to exchange documents substantiating their respective sales numbers (including the production of Form 852s by Plaintiff and electronic item level data by Defendant) on or before 11/5/2021. A continued Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference is set for 12/7/2021 8:30 AM and will be held via Zoom. All parties, counsel, and client representatives shall participate in the conference using the same Zoom meeting information used for the 10/6/2021 conference. Updated settlement conference briefs shall be submitted to efile_brooks@casd.uscourts.gov on or before 11/30/2021. The parties may exchange their briefs or may submit them confidentially. (no document attached) (cxc) [Transferred from California Southern on 12/28/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Phamatech Incorporated.(Stein, Dwayne)(jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/28/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2021 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 9/2/2021.(jrm) [Transferred from California Southern on 12/28/2021.]
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Phamatech Incorporated by Walgreen, Co..(Williams, Jeffrey) (jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/28/2021.]
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Walgreen, Co. answer due 9/1/2021. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/3/2021. (jrm) [Transferred from California Southern on 12/28/2021.]
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Walgreen, Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey N. Williams)(Williams, Jeffrey)Attorney Jeffrey N. Williams added to party Walgreen, Co.(pty:dft)(jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/28/2021.]
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phamatech Incorporated. Walgreen, Co. served. (Stein, Dwayne) (jrm). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/28/2021.]
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ekb) (jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/28/2021.]
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1-10, Walgreen, Co. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15905233.), filed by Phamatech Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1234-AJB-RBB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Stein, Dwayne)(ekb) (jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/28/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phamatech Incorporated v. Walgreen, Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Phamatech Incorporated
Represented By: Dwayne H. Stein
Represented By: Dennis F. Esford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?