Drake v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company a.k.a Mutual of Omaha
Plaintiff: Renee Drake
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company a.k.a Mutual of Omaha, United Omaha Life Insurance Company and Mutual of Omaha
Case Number: 1:2021cv06892
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Referring Judge: Heather K McShain
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Heather K. McShain: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report #17 , which states that defendant produced documents relating to the insurance claim at issue on 02/09/2022, and plaintiff is reviewing the production to determine what further written discovery and depositions are needed. Further joint status report on the same issues as the instant status report due 04/22/2022. The parties should be mindful that, notwithstanding any preference to take depositions in person, they cannot expect this in the current environment, nor can they reasonably expect the case to be put on hold until that changes. To be more specific, the parties are to assume that all depositions will have to be taken by remote means (unless both sides and the witness consent to an in-person deposition) and are to plan accordingly. Delay due to a desire to take in-person depositions at a later date will not be a basis for extending any discovery deadline beyond the current deadline. The parties may contact chambers at any time (by email to Chambers_McShain@ilnd.uscourts.gov) if they would like the Court's assistance with settlement. Mailed notice. (pk, )
February 18, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service (Litwin, Leonard)
February 18, 2022 Filing 17 STATUS Report by Renee Drake (Litwin, Leonard)
January 19, 2022 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Heather K. McShain: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge McShain for discovery supervision (to include authority to set further discovery deadlines) and settlement matters [ #14 , #15 ]. On review of Judge Coleman's Minute Order of 01/18/2022 #14 , the parties shall file a joint status report, on or before 2/21/2022, to update the Court on: (a) fact discovery, including the progress of written discovery and the parties' deposition plans; (b) the state of settlement discussions, if any; and (c) any other matters the parties believe should be brought to the Court's attention. The parties should be mindful that, notwithstanding any preference to take depositions in person, they cannot expect this in the current environment, nor can they reasonably expect the case to be put on hold until that changes. To be more specific, the parties are to assume that all depositions will have to be taken by remote means (unless both sides and the witness consent to an in-person deposition) and are to plan accordingly. Delay due to a desire to take in-person depositions at a later date will not be a basis for extending any discovery deadline beyond the current deadline. The parties may contact chambers at any time (by email to Chambers_McShain@ilnd.uscourts.gov) should they be interested in discussing settlement. Mailed notice. (pk, )
January 18, 2022 Filing 15 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Heather K. McShain for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision and settlement conference. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 18, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone status hearing held on 1/18/2022. All written discovery to be completed by 2/28/2022. All fact discovery to be completed by 7/1/2022. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge McShain for discovery supervision and settlement discussions. Judge McShain has authority to set any further discovery deadlines. Status hearing is set for 6/10/2022 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 16, 2022 Filing 13 Reply to Affirmative Defenses by Renee Drake (Litwin, Leonard)
January 13, 2022 Filing 12 New Case Joint Status Report by Renee Drake (Litwin, Leonard)
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone status hearing set for 3/2/2022 is stricken and reset to 1/18/2022 at 9:45 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by United Omaha Life Insurance Company(Brenner, Todd)
January 4, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Todd A. Benner's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #8 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 4, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19019457. (Brenner, Todd)
December 30, 2021 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (exr, )
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Telephone status hearing is set for 3/2/2022 at 9:30 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Defendant is directed to advise the Plaintiff of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 30, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (exr, )
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company a.k.a Mutual of Omaha by Brian Richard Grimm (Grimm, Brian)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company a.k.a Mutual of Omaha re notice of removal #1 (Reed, Timothy)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company a.k.a Mutual of Omaha by Timothy James Reed (Reed, Timothy)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Reed, Timothy)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2021L011972) filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company a.k.a Mutual of Omaha Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19005139. (Reed, Timothy)
December 29, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drake v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company a.k.a Mutual of Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Drake
Represented By: Leonard David Litwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company a.k.a Mutual of Omaha
Represented By: Brian Richard Grimm
Represented By: Timothy James Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian Richard Grimm
Represented By: Timothy James Reed
Represented By: Todd A. Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual of Omaha
Represented By: Brian Richard Grimm
Represented By: Timothy James Reed
Represented By: Todd A. Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?