US Foods, Inc. v. SRG South Hills, LLC et al
Plaintiff: US Foods, Inc.
Defendant: SRG South Hills, LLC, SRG Downtown, LLC, SRG State College, LLC, Stackman, LLC, SRG Eastside, LLC, Stern Altoona Enterprises, Inc., SRG South Hills, LLC doing business as BRGR South Hills, SRG Downtown, LLC doing business as BRGR Downtown, SRG State College, LLC doing business as BRGR State College, Stackman, LLC doing business as Willow, SRG Eastside, LLC doing business as BRGR Eastside and Stern Altoona Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Manor Theater
Case Number: 1:2021cv06915
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: In lieu of an initial status hearing, the Court directs the parties to, no more than 14 days from the date of this order, confer to discuss the nature and bases of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. The parties shall also discuss deadlines for Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures and a proposed discovery plan. A written initial status report and proposed discovery plan shall be filed no later than March 14, 2022. Plaintiff is responsible for initiating such a meeting, and all lead counsel for all parties are required to participate. Failure or refusal to participate in such a meeting or to cooperate in the preparation of the written report may constitute a basis for sanctions. The Court will thereafter issue an order setting a discovery schedule. Mailed notice. (kp, )
February 7, 2022 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff US Foods, Inc. by Peter John Roberts (Roberts, Peter)
February 7, 2022 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff US Foods, Inc. by Christina M Sanfelippo (Sanfelippo, Christina)
February 7, 2022 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff US Foods, Inc. by Brian L. Shaw (Shaw, Brian)
January 31, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by SRG Downtown, LLC, SRG Eastside, LLC, SRG South Hills, LLC, SRG State College, LLC, Stackman, LLC, Stern Altoona Enterprises, Inc.(Holmquist, Alexander)
January 12, 2022 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Attorneys Alexander L Holmquist, Robert O Lampl and James R. Cooney's motion to appear pro hac vice on behalf of all defendants #13 , #14 , #15 is granted. Mailed notice. (kp, )
January 11, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19046048. (Cooney, James)
January 11, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19045980. (Lampl, Robert)
January 11, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19045922. (Holmquist, Alexander)
January 3, 2022 Filing 12 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (rc, )
January 3, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Defendants' unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #10 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead no later than January 31, 2022. Mailed notice. (kp, )
January 3, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (rc, )
December 31, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants SRG Downtown, LLC, SRG Eastside, LLC, SRG South Hills, LLC, SRG State College, LLC, Stackman, LLC, Stern Altoona Enterprises, Inc. for extension of time to file answer Joint Motion (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Richard)
December 30, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants SRG Downtown, LLC, SRG Eastside, LLC, SRG South Hills, LLC, SRG State College, LLC, Stackman, LLC, Stern Altoona Enterprises, Inc. by Richard M. Hoffman (Hoffman, Richard)
December 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Stern Altoona Enterprises, Inc. (Hoffman, Richard)
December 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Stackman, LLC (Hoffman, Richard)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by SRG State College, LLC (Hoffman, Richard)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by SRG South Hills, LLC (Hoffman, Richard)
December 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by SRG Eastside, LLC (Hoffman, Richard)
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by SRG Downtown, LLC (Hoffman, Richard)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hoffman, Richard)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2021L011692) filed by SRG Downtown, LLC, SRG Eastside, LLC, SRG South Hills, LLC, SRG State College, LLC, Stackman, LLC, Stern Altoona Enterprises, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19007285. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Declaration Stern Declaration)(Hoffman, Richard)
December 30, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Foods, Inc. v. SRG South Hills, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Brian L. Shaw
Represented By: Corey Thomas Hickman
Represented By: Peter John Roberts
Represented By: Christina M Sanfelippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRG South Hills, LLC
Represented By: Richard M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRG Downtown, LLC
Represented By: Richard M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRG State College, LLC
Represented By: Richard M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stackman, LLC
Represented By: Richard M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRG Eastside, LLC
Represented By: Richard M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stern Altoona Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRG South Hills, LLC doing business as BRGR South Hills
Represented By: Alexander L Holmquist
Represented By: James R. Cooney
Represented By: Richard M. Hoffman
Represented By: Robert O Lampl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRG Downtown, LLC doing business as BRGR Downtown
Represented By: Alexander L Holmquist
Represented By: James R. Cooney
Represented By: Richard M. Hoffman
Represented By: Robert O Lampl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRG State College, LLC doing business as BRGR State College
Represented By: Alexander L Holmquist
Represented By: James R. Cooney
Represented By: Richard M. Hoffman
Represented By: Robert O Lampl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stackman, LLC doing business as Willow
Represented By: Alexander L Holmquist
Represented By: James R. Cooney
Represented By: Richard M. Hoffman
Represented By: Robert O Lampl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRG Eastside, LLC doing business as BRGR Eastside
Represented By: Alexander L Holmquist
Represented By: James R. Cooney
Represented By: Richard M. Hoffman
Represented By: Robert O Lampl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stern Altoona Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Manor Theater
Represented By: Alexander L Holmquist
Represented By: James R. Cooney
Represented By: Richard M. Hoffman
Represented By: Robert O Lampl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?