Jacobs v. Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Leroy Jacobs
Defendant: Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00002
Filed: January 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2022 at 09:45 AM (to track the case only; no appearance is required). The parties' joint Rule 26(f) planning report is due 4/4/2022. (The form of the report can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.) The court will set a schedule based on the report. Mailed notice (reg)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. (ng, )
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jj, )
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxj, )
January 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Leroy Jacobs by Spencer Sheehan (Sheehan, Spencer)
January 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sheehan, Spencer)
January 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Leroy Jacobs; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19010711.(Sheehan, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Jacobs
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?