ND Products, Inc. v. Does 1-359 as Identified in Exhibit 2
Plaintiff: Patent Holder Identified in Exhibit 1 and ND Products, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-359 as Identified in Exhibit 2 and Jingdong E-commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited
Case Number: 1:2022cv00099
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin John Keener for presentment of motion for default judgment #38 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 3/10/2022 at 01:45 PM. (Keener, Kevin)
March 7, 2022 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM by ND Products, Inc. in support of motion for default judgment #38 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Keener, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Kevin Keener, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Kevin Keener, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Kevin Keener, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Kevin Keener)(Keener, Kevin)
March 7, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION by Plaintiff ND Products, Inc. for default judgment as to unappearing defendants (Keener, Kevin)
March 7, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ND Products, Inc. with prejudice of Doe 219 MHOMER LLC (Keener, Kevin)
February 28, 2022 Filing 36 STIPULATION - Stipulation to Extend Deadlines Regarding Joybuy (Doe Defendant 195) (Airan, David)
February 25, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ND Products, Inc. with prejudice of Doe 100 joseph-shop10; Doe 166 Lovely Pets Home; Doe 180 tiger&fish618; Doe 186 yangguang8store; Doe 242 ZhaDaa (Keener, Kevin)
February 24, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ND Products, Inc. with prejudice of Doe 14 KENANFADA; Doe 69 best-shopping-with-us; Doe 85 ep_household; Doe 117 rodolfpemjea_0; Doe 130 zm_trade; Doe 171 Philp; Doe 179 thyshesonxsdnkj; Doe 288 bookidtoys/hg_outlet; Doe 301 tanner--brock (Keener, Kevin)
February 21, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ND Products, Inc. without prejudice of Doe 139 chenlixiao; Doe 347 TheWorldwideMall (Keener, Kevin)
February 21, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ND Products, Inc. with prejudice of Doe 3 ARMYGS; Doe 20 Romango; Doe 22 Ruiqi Business; Doe 35 Fengxingjd; Doe 39 Lenny1029; Doe 56 Zyjbeauty; Doe 62 amazing-usa-deal; Doe 67 best_for_all76; Doe 75 dineshshrestha; Doe 78 dudigalabrgel; Doe 89 fikwah0; Doe 90 first-seller-80; Doe 105 melanatedtshirt; Doe 110 next-store-1; Doe 115 razbenshimon8; Doe 118 royal-products-1; Doe 140 chenqinjun Store; Doe 155 Hey, PICO; Doe 192 zhengpang; Doe 202 BraceID; Doe 220 Musesound; Doe 283 avrkdo_0; Doe 285 best_productssk; Doe 286 best-invest4u; Doe 291 gentleman-store; Doe 296 reefbenmeir12-5; Doe 298 sihaz-12; Doe 303 yoyun_97 (Keener, Kevin)
February 11, 2022 Filing 31 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 2/11/2022:Mailed notice(rj, )
February 9, 2022 Filing 30 STIPULATION regarding order on motion for preliminary injunction,,,,, terminate deadlines and hearings,,,,, set/reset hearings,,,, #27 (Keener, Kevin)
February 8, 2022 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jingdong E-commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited by Nicole E. Kopinski (Kopinski, Nicole)
February 8, 2022 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jingdong E-commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited by David M. Airan (Airan, David)
February 8, 2022 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #22 . The Court strikes the status date set for 2/9/2022 and resets it to 3/10/2022 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiff should notice any motions for default judgment for that date. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
February 8, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ND Products, Inc. of Doe 297 sigal_sl123 (Keener, Kevin)
February 8, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ND Products, Inc. of Doe 12 BENBIAO (Keener, Kevin)
February 8, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ND Products, Inc. without prejudice of Doe 13 HUIBAO-US (Keener, Kevin)
February 4, 2022 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by ND Products, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #22 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Keener, #2 Exhibit 1)(Keener, Kevin)
February 4, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION by Plaintiff ND Products, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Keener, Kevin)
February 4, 2022 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ND Products, Inc. as to ND Products, Inc. on 2/4/2022, answer due 2/25/2022. (Keener, Kevin)
February 3, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ND Products, Inc. without prejudice of Doe 279 toys2010 Store (Keener, Kevin)
February 3, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ND Products, Inc. without prejudice of Doe 26 ZCXD Store; Doe 60 ahmed0162570871/daydreamtailors; Doe 99 kesem_us; Doe 218 MDDerict; Doe 272 Manufacturers sell vari (Keener, Kevin)
February 3, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Does 1-359 as Identified in Exhibit 2 (ak, )
January 26, 2022 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis:The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for extension of the temporary restraining order #17 . The Court extends the TRO through 2/9/2022. The Court strikes the status date set for 1/27/2022 and resets it to 2/9/2022 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff should notice any motion for preliminary injunction to that date. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
January 24, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiff ND Products, Inc. for extension of time to Temporary Restraining Order (Keener, Kevin)
January 18, 2022 Filing 16 SURETY BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 posted by ND Products, Inc. (Document not scanned). (kl, )
January 13, 2022 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ND Products, Inc. by Kevin John Keener (Keener, Kevin)
January 13, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED complaint by Patent Holder Identified in Exhibit 1 against Does 1-359 as Identified in Exhibit 2 (Keener, Kevin)
January 13, 2022 Terminating Patent Holder Identified in Exhibit 1 (Keener, Kevin)
January 13, 2022 NEW PARTIES: ND Products, Inc. added to case caption. (Keener, Kevin)
January 12, 2022 Filing 15 EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER with asset freeze and other equitable relief. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 1/12/2022. Mailed notice. (kl, )
January 12, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Plaintiff's motions to seal #7 , for leave to file excess pages #8 , and for temporary restraining order #9 . The Court does not permit Plaintiff to proceed under an alias and Plaintiff should file a complaint under Plaintiff's name. The Court sets a status date for 1/27/2022 at 1:30 p.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin John Keener for presentment of motion for leave to file #8 , motion to seal document #7 , motion for temporary restraining order #9 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 1/13/2022 at 01:45 PM. (Keener, Kevin)
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Patent Holder Identified in Exhibit 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for TRO (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Declaration of Kevin Keener, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Kevin Keener, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Kevin Keener, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Kevin Keener, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Kevin Keener)(Keener, Kevin)
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Patent Holder Identified in Exhibit 1 for temporary restraining order asset restraining order, expedited discovery, and electronic service of process (Keener, Kevin)
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Patent Holder Identified in Exhibit 1 for leave to file excess pages for Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of TRO (Keener, Kevin)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Patent Holder Identified in Exhibit 1 to seal document sealed document, #5 , sealed document, #2 Exhibits to Complaint; Memorandum in Support of Motion for TRO (Keener, Kevin)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (kl, )
January 10, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cm, )
January 10, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )
January 9, 2022 Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Patent Holder Identified in Exhibit 1 resubmitted (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2- part 1 of 5, #2 Exhibit 2- part 2 of 5, #3 Exhibit 2- part 3 of 5, #4 Exhibit 2- part 4 of 5, #5 Exhibit 2- part 5 of 5, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4)(Keener, Kevin)
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patent Holder Identified in Exhibit 1 by Kevin John Keener (Keener, Kevin)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Keener, Kevin)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Patent Holder Identified in Exhibit 1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2- part 1 of 5, #2 Exhibit 2- part 2 of 5, #3 Exhibit 2- part 3 of 5, #4 Exhibit 2- part 4 of 5, #5 Exhibit 2- part 5 of 5, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4)(Keener, Kevin)
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Patent Holder Identified in Exhibit 1; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19031750. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1, 2, 3, and 4 under seal)(Keener, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ND Products, Inc. v. Does 1-359 as Identified in Exhibit 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patent Holder Identified in Exhibit 1
Represented By: Kevin John Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ND Products, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin John Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-359 as Identified in Exhibit 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jingdong E-commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited
Represented By: David M. Airan
Represented By: Nicole E. Kopinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?