Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a MidWest Foods v. Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a MidWest Foods and Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. an Indiana corporation doing business as Midwest Foods
Defendant: Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC, Charles Metzger and Chuck
Case Number: 1:2022cv00234
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The parties shall file a joint status report by 4/1/22 to report on their exchange of information and efforts to resolve the case without formal discovery. Notices mailed. (psm, )
March 1, 2022 Filing 21 STATUS Report JOINT STATUS REPORT by Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. (Khuans, Nicollette)
February 25, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Charles Metzger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lazar, Denise)
February 22, 2022 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Charles Metzger by Denise A. Lazar (Lazar, Denise)
February 16, 2022 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time to answer #17 is granted. Defendant Metzger's response to the complaint is due 2/25/22. The parties' status report remains due 3/1/22. (mss)
February 15, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant Charles Metzger for extension of time to file answer until February 25, 2022 (Agreed) (Hemmer, Andrew)
February 15, 2022 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC, Charles Metzger by Andrew Hemmer (Hemmer, Andrew)
February 1, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. as to Charles Metzger on 1/25/2022, answer due 2/15/2022. (Khuans, Nicollette)
February 1, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. as to Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC on 1/19/2022, answer due 2/9/2022. (Khuans, Nicollette)
January 31, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Telephone status hearing held. Defendant's motion to deposit funds #11 is granted. For the reasons stated on the record, a joint status report is due on or before 3/1/22. Mailed notice (mjc, )
January 26, 2022 Filing 12 BOND in the amount of $ $52,500.00 check, Receipt No. 4624267265, posted by Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC (cxr, ) (lw, ).
January 26, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC to deposit funds (Attachments: #1 Supplement Registry Deposit Info Form)(Lazar, Denise)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 1/25/2022: Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Docket No. 4] is withdrawn without prejudice to reinstate if the deposit is not made by Hearthside. Without prejudice to any of its defenses in this matter, Defendant Hearthside through its counsel Barnes & Thornburg, shall deposit with the Clerk of Court a bond in the amount of $52,500 via check, by January 26, 2022 during the pendency of this matter. The Clerk of Court is directed to invest the funds into CRIS until further order of the Court. Hearthside shall provide Plaintiff's counsel with confirmation of this deposit. Status in this matter is set for Monday, January 31, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. Parties to the case, members of the public, and the media, may participate in/listen to these proceedings by dialing 1-888-204-5984 and using access code 9146677. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notices mailed. (psm, )
January 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC (Lazar, Denise)
January 21, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC in Opposition to motion for temporary restraining order #4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Julie Wool)(Lazar, Denise)
January 21, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Order)(Lazar, Denise)
January 21, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC by Denise A. Lazar (Lazar, Denise)
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Telephone hearing on plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction is set for 1/21/2022 at 11:30 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel must give notice of the hearing date and time to defendants. Parties to the case, members of the public, and the media may participate in/listen to these proceedings by dialing 1-888-204-5984 and using access code 9146677. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notices mailed. (psm, )
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a MidWest Foods for temporary restraining order and for a preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B)(Serritella, William)
January 18, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC, Charles Metzger (ak, )
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a MidWest Foods by Nicollette Liv Khuans (Khuans, Nicollette)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a MidWest Foods by William J. Serritella, Jr (Serritella, William)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a MidWest Foods; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19058234. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Group Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Serritella, William)
January 14, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lxk, )
January 14, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a MidWest Foods v. Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a MidWest Foods
Represented By: Nicollette Liv Khuans
Represented By: William J. Serritella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. an Indiana corporation doing business as Midwest Foods
Represented By: William J. Serritella, Jr.
Represented By: Nicollette Liv Khuans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Denise A. Lazar
Represented By: Andrew Hemmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Metzger
Represented By: Denise A. Lazar
Represented By: Andrew Hemmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck
Represented By: Denise A. Lazar
Represented By: Andrew Hemmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?