Hightower Holding, LLC v. NGP Financial Planning, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hightower Holding, LLC
Defendant: NGP Financial Planning, LLC and Michael Policar
Case Number: 1:2022cv00257
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Filing 18 Disclosure of Corporate Interests by NGP Financial Planning, LLC (Bossard, Rachel)
March 1, 2022 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Agreed motion for third extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #15 is granted to and including 4/12/2022 in view of the scheduled mediation. Notice of motion date of 3/2/2022 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Emailed notice (cdh, )
February 25, 2022 Filing 16 Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Rachel Edlinger Bossard for presentment of extension of time #15 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 3/2/2022 at 09:15 AM. (Bossard, Rachel)
February 25, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendants NGP Financial Planning, LLC, Michael Policar for extension of time Agreed Motion for Third Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Bossard, Rachel)
February 21, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Upon review of the joint status report #13 , the Court accepts the parties' proposed case management plan, including the completion of all fact and expert discovery by 11/14/2022. The parties are directed to file an interim joint status report on the progress of fact discovery and any mediation and/or settlement discussions no later than 8/31/2022. If the parties would like a referral to the Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference, they may contact the Courtroom Deputy at any time. Emailed notice (cdh, )
February 19, 2022 Filing 13 STATUS Report (Joint) by NGP Financial Planning, LLC, Michael Policar (Ramirez, Geneva)
February 16, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Agreed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #10 is granted to and including 2/25/2022. Notice of motion date of 2/17/2022 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Emailed notice (cdh, )
February 11, 2022 Filing 11 Agreed Motion for Second Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead NOTICE of Motion by Rachel Edlinger Bossard for presentment of extension of time #10 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 2/17/2022 at 09:15 AM. (Bossard, Rachel)
February 11, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants NGP Financial Planning, LLC, Michael Policar for extension of time Agreed Motion for Second Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Bossard, Rachel)
January 24, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Unopposed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead for all served Defendants #7 is granted to and including 2/11/2022. Notice of motion date of 1/25/2022 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Joint status report is due no later than 2/18/2022. Emailed notice (cdh, )
January 21, 2022 Filing 8 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead NOTICE of Motion by Rachel Edlinger Bossard for presentment of extension of time #7 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 1/25/2022 at 09:15 AM. (Bossard, Rachel)
January 21, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendants NGP Financial Planning, LLC, Michael Policar for extension of time Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Bossard, Rachel)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to Avanti Bakane (daj, )
January 18, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (daj, )
January 14, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants NGP Financial Planning, LLC, Michael Policar by Geneva Claflin Ramirez (Ramirez, Geneva)
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 JURY Demand (Bossard, Rachel)
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants NGP Financial Planning, LLC, Michael Policar by Rachel Edlinger Bossard (Bossard, Rachel)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bossard, Rachel)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from state, case number (2021-L-012593) filed by NGP Financial, LLC, Michael Policar Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19059747. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bossard, Rachel)
January 14, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, )
January 14, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (sxh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hightower Holding, LLC v. NGP Financial Planning, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hightower Holding, LLC
Represented By: Avanti Bakane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NGP Financial Planning, LLC
Represented By: Geneva Claflin Ramirez
Represented By: Rachel Edlinger Bossard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Policar
Represented By: Geneva Claflin Ramirez
Represented By: Rachel Edlinger Bossard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?