November 4, 2022 |
Filing 24
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #23 , this case is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated. Notices mailed. (psm, )
|
November 3, 2022 |
Filing 23
STIPULATION of Dismissal (McCready, Michael)
|
October 13, 2022 |
Filing 22
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiff shall respond to the motion to dismiss by 11/3/22, and defendant may reply by 11/17/22. No status report on 10/18/22 is necessary. The parties shall brief the pending motions and the court will rule by cm/ecf. The motion to stay discovery #21 is granted. Discovery is stayed. Notices mailed. (psm, )
|
October 13, 2022 |
Filing 21
MOTION by Defendant United States of America to stay discovery (agreed) (DeCelles, David)
|
October 12, 2022 |
Filing 20
MEMORANDUM by United States of America in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #19 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(DeCelles, David)
|
October 12, 2022 |
Filing 19
MOTION by Defendant United States of America to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (opposed) (DeCelles, David)
|
September 21, 2022 |
Filing 18
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Non-medical fact discovery closes 10/19/22. The parties should take the relevant fact witness depositions before that deadline. The parties shall file a status report on 10/18/22 proposing a deadline for treater depositions, expert discovery, and dispositive motions. Notices mailed. (psm, )
|
September 20, 2022 |
Filing 17
STATUS Report regarding discovery progress (joint) by United States of America (DeCelles, David)
|
September 19, 2022 |
Filing 16
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiff's response to the motion to amend #15 is due 10/14/22 and the government's reply is due 10/21/22. The court will rule by cm/ecf. The parties' discovery status report remains due 9/20/22. Notices mailed. (psm, )
|
September 16, 2022 |
Filing 15
MOTION by Defendant United States of America to amend/correct answer to complaint #6 (amended and opposed motion) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed amended complaint)(DeCelles, David)
|
September 16, 2022 |
Filing 14
MOTION by Defendant United States of America to amend/correct answer (opposed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed amended answer)(DeCelles, David)
|
August 11, 2022 |
Filing 13
AGREED PRIVACY ACT AND HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 8/11/2022. Notices mailed. (psm, )
|
August 10, 2022 |
Filing 12
MOTION by Defendant United States of America for protective order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DeCelles, David)
|
July 28, 2022 |
Filing 11
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The parties' next status report on discovery progress is due 9/20/22. Notices mailed. (psm, )
|
July 27, 2022 |
Filing 10
STATUS Report on discovery progress by United States of America (DeCelles, David)
|
April 20, 2022 |
Filing 9
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The parties shall exchange initial disclosures by 5/3/22 and all non-medical fact discovery must be noticed in time for completion by 10/19/22. Written discovery from plaintiff's medical treaters must also be completed by 10/19/22. In other words, the parties will be allowed to schedule treater depositions after 10/19/22, but all written discovery must be completed by then. Any requests to amend the pleadings must be made by 08/10/22. The court will set the remainder of the schedule when the parties get closer to completing fact discovery. An agreed proposed confidentiality order may be submitted to proposed_order_shah@ilnd.uscourts.gov. The parties may contact susan_mcclintic@ilnd.uscourts.gov for a settlement referral. The parties shall file a status report on discovery progress on 7/27/22. Notices mailed. (psm, )
|
April 19, 2022 |
Filing 8
STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by United States of America (DeCelles, David)
|
April 13, 2022 |
Filing 7
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The parties shall file a joint initial status report by 4/19/22. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
|
April 8, 2022 |
Filing 6
ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America(DeCelles, David)
|
April 8, 2022 |
Filing 5
DESIGNATION of David Harold DeCelles as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United States of America (DeCelles, David)
|
February 3, 2022 |
SUMMONS Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (ak, )
|
January 28, 2022 |
Filing 4
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chiquita Gill by Jess Dennis Jordan (Jordan, Jess)
|
January 28, 2022 |
Filing 3
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chiquita Gill by Rogelio Garcia (Garcia, Rogelio)
|
January 28, 2022 |
Filing 2
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chiquita Gill by Michael Patrick McCready (McCready, Michael)
|
January 25, 2022 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT filed by Chiquita Gill; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19087010. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCready, Michael)
|
January 25, 2022 |
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
|
January 25, 2022 |
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached
|