Turner v. Computershare, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gary T Turner
Defendant: Computershare, Inc., Lam Research Corporation, BNY Mellon Shareholder Services and Bank Of America Corp.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00810
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: For the reasons stated in the motion, the Court grants Defendant Bank Of America Corp.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint #21 . The deadline for Defendant Bank Of America Corp. to file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 04/29/2022. Additionally, pursuant to Plaintiff's notice of dismissal #23 , this action is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) against Defendant Computeshare, Inc., with each side to bear its own costs and fees. The Court advises the parties that, generally speaking, Seventh Circuit decisions hold that dismissals "with prejudice" leave the Court without jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement. See Shapo v. Engle, 463 F.3d 641, 646 (7th Cir. 2006). Mailed notice (axc).
April 13, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Jesky, TJ)
April 4, 2022 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bank Of America Corp. by Michael James Stern (Stern, Michael)
April 4, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendant Bank Of America Corp. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Agreed) (Motto, Joseph)
April 4, 2022 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Bank Of America Corp. (Motto, Joseph)
April 4, 2022 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bank Of America Corp. by Joseph Laurence Motto (Motto, Joseph)
April 4, 2022 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: For the reasons stated in the motion, the Court grants Defendant BNY Mellon Shareholder Services' (BNY) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint #17 . The deadline for Defendant BNY to file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 04/29/2022. Mailed notice (axc).
March 30, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant BNY Mellon Shareholder Services for extension of time (Unopposed) of Responsive Pleading Deadline (Carwinski, Timothy)
March 30, 2022 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BNY Mellon Shareholder Services by Timothy Robert Carwinski (Carwinski, Timothy)
March 29, 2022 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: For the reasons stated in the motion, the Court grants Defendant Lam Research Corporation's Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead #14 . The Deadline for Defendants to file their Answer or Otherwise Plead is extended to 04/29/2022. The joint initial status report deadline is extended to 05/06/2022. Mailed notice (axc). Modified on 3/30/2022 (axc, ).
March 28, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Lam Research Corporation for extension of time Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (All Defendants) (Lasko, Bennett)
March 28, 2022 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Lam Research Corporation CORRECTED (Lasko, Bennett)
March 28, 2022 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Lam Research Corporation (Lasko, Bennett)
March 28, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lam Research Corporation by Bennett W. Lasko (Lasko, Bennett)
March 24, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary T Turner as to Lam Research Corporation on 3/11/2022, answer due 4/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Summons Return of Service)(Jesky, TJ)
March 24, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary T Turner as to Bank Of America Corp. on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Summons Return of Service)(Jesky, TJ)
March 24, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary T Turner as to Computershare, Inc. on 3/8/2022, answer due 3/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Summons Return of Service)(Jesky, TJ)
March 24, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary T Turner as to BNY Mellon Shareholder Services on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Summons Return of Service)(Jesky, TJ)
March 8, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BNY Mellon Shareholder Services, Bank Of America Corp., Computershare, Inc., Lam Research Corporation (sxh, )
February 16, 2022 Filing 6 COMPLAINT Corrected filed by Gary T Turner; (Jesky, TJ)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jesky, TJ)
February 15, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 05/02/2022 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Mailed notice (axc).
February 15, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
February 15, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (dxb, )
February 14, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gary T Turner by TJ Jesky (Jesky, TJ)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jesky, TJ)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Gary T Turner; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19155682.(Jesky, TJ) (Incorrect pdf document linked - Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.). Modified on 2/15/2022 (aee, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Computershare, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary T Turner
Represented By: TJ Jesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computershare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lam Research Corporation
Represented By: Bennett W. Lasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNY Mellon Shareholder Services
Represented By: Timothy Robert Carwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America Corp.
Represented By: Joseph Laurence Motto
Represented By: Michael James Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?