Goodman/Friedman, LLC v. CBC Restaurant Corp. d/b/a Corner Bakery Cafe
Defendant: CBC Restaurant Corp. d/b/a Corner Bakery Cafe and CBC Restaurant Corp. doing business as Corner Bakery Cafe
Counter Defendant: Goodman/Friedman, LLC
Counter Claimant: CBC Restaurant Corp.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00946
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by CBC Restaurant Corp. against Goodman/Friedman, LLC . by CBC Restaurant Corp.(Edlund, Mitchell)
April 7, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephonic motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for entry of default #7 is continued pending Defendant's response to the pleadings. Defendant's motion for extension of time to file an answer #11 is granted. Defendants shall have until 4/20/2022 to answer or otherwise plead. Telephonic status hearing set for 5/10/2022 at 9:45 a.m. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Mailed notice (maf)
April 6, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp. for extension of time to file answer Plaintiff's Complaint (Edlund, Mitchell)
April 6, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp. by Mitchell J. Edlund (Edlund, Mitchell)
April 4, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Motion for entry of default #7 will be heard via telephonic status conference set for 4/7/22 at 9:30 a.m. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Mailed notice(maf)
March 31, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by Goodman/Friedman, LLC re status report #6 , MOTION by Plaintiff Goodman/Friedman, LLC for entry of default #7 (Bauch, Paul)
March 31, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Goodman/Friedman, LLC for entry of default (Bauch, Paul)
March 31, 2022 Filing 6 STATUS Report Plaintiff's by Goodman/Friedman, LLC (Bauch, Paul)
February 28, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Goodman/Friedman, LLC as to CBC Restaurant Corp. on 2/23/2022, answer due 3/16/2022. (Bauch, Paul)
February 24, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephonic status conference set for 4/7/22 at 9:30 a.m. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Joint status report shall be filed by 3/31/22. Mailed notice(maf)
February 23, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant CBC Restaurant Corp. d/b/a Corner Bakery Cafe (ey, )
February 22, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET (Sales, Carolina)
February 22, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Goodman/Friedman, LLC by Carolina Y. Sales (Sales, Carolina)
February 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Goodman/Friedman, LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19180144. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bauch, Paul)
February 22, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ey, )
February 22, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ey, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodman/Friedman, LLC v. CBC Restaurant Corp. d/b/a Corner Bakery Cafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Goodman/Friedman, LLC
Represented By: Carolina Y. Sales
Represented By: Paul M. Bauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBC Restaurant Corp. d/b/a Corner Bakery Cafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBC Restaurant Corp. doing business as Corner Bakery Cafe
Represented By: Mitchell J. Edlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: CBC Restaurant Corp.
Represented By: Mitchell J. Edlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?