North Texas Equal Access Fund et al v. Thomas More Society
Plaintiff: North Texas Equal Access Fund and Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity
Defendant: Thomas More Society
Case Number: 1:2022cv01399
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: No party requested briefing on the topic of certification. See #21 . Thus, the court by this order provides notice to the Texas Attorney General under 28 U.S.C. 2403(b): "In any action, suit, or proceeding in a court of the United States to which a State or any agency, officer, or employee thereof is not a party, wherein the constitutionality of any statute of that State affecting the public interest is drawn in question, the court shall certify such fact to the attorney general of the State, and shall permit the State to intervene for presentation of evidence, if evidence is otherwise admissible in the case, and for argument on the question of constitutionality...." See also Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.1(b) ("The court must, under 28 U.S.C. 2403, certify to the appropriate attorney general that a statute has been questioned."); N.D. Ill. L.R. 24.1; Tonya K. by Diane K. v. Bd. of Educ. of City of Chicago, 847 F.2d 1243, 1247 (7th Cir. 1988). The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to Attorney General of Texas Ken Paxton, Office of the Texas Attorney General, P.O. Box 12548, Austin, TX 78711-2548, and const_claims@texasattorneygeneral.gov. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 5/6/2022. Mailed notice. (kl, )
May 6, 2022 MAILED copy of order #26 to the Attorney General of Texas Ken Paxton, Office of the Texas Attorney General, P.O. Box 12548, Austin, TX 78711-2548, and emailed to const_claims@texasattorneygeneral.gov (kl, )
May 2, 2022 Filing 25 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity, North Texas Equal Access Fund (Moore, Dremain)
April 29, 2022 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant's unopposed motion to file amended motion to dismiss #22 is granted. Defendant has filed the amended motion to dismiss #23 on the docket. The original motion to dismiss #20 is stricken. (rao, )
April 28, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendant Thomas More Society to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (AMENDED) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Declaration)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
April 28, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendant Thomas More Society to amend/correct MOTION by Defendant Thomas More Society to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #20 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
April 25, 2022 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's motion to dismiss #20 is due by 5/16/2022; Defendant's reply is due by 6/1/2022. If the parties need more time, they may request an extension. 2. Separately, plaintiffs filed a Notice of Constitutional Question pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.1(a)(1)(B) and Northern District of Illinois Local Rule 24.1. #19 . Plaintiffs state that they served a copy of the complaint on the Texas Attorney General. Under 28 U.S.C. 2403(b): "In any action, suit, or proceeding in a court of the United States to which a State or any agency, officer, or employee thereof is not a party, wherein the constitutionality of any statute of that State affecting the public interest is drawn in question, the court shall certify such fact to the attorney general of the State, and shall permit the State to intervene for presentation of evidence, if evidence is otherwise admissible in the case, and for argument on the question of constitutionality...." See also Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.1(b) ("The court must, under 28 U.S.C. 2403, certify to the appropriate attorney general that a statute has been questioned."); N.D. Ill. L.R. 24.1; Tonya K. by Diane K. v. Bd. of Educ. of City of Chicago, 847 F.2d 1243, 1247 (7th Cir. 1988). If any party believes briefing is necessary with respect to the certification, that party should file a statement by 4:00 pm on 4/29/2022 proposing a briefing schedule. (rao, )
April 21, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant Thomas More Society to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Declaration)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
April 20, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE by Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity, North Texas Equal Access Fund Plaintiffs' Notice of Constitutionality Question (Attachments: #1 Challenge to Constitutionality of a State Statute)(Lorenc, Susan)
April 18, 2022 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Thomas More Society by Martin J. Whittaker (Whittaker, Martin)
April 14, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE by Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity, North Texas Equal Access Fund re complaint, #1 Notice of Filing of Redacted Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit G 10.28.21 Temporary Injunction Order - Redacted)(Lorenc, Susan)
April 8, 2022 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant's unopposed motion to extend time to file answer or motion to dismiss #15 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 4/21/2022. The initial joint status report is due 4/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, )
April 8, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Thomas More Society for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 (Unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion to seal Exhibit G to the complaint #12 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to place [1-7], Exhibit G, under seal. Plaintiffs are directed to file by 4/15/2022 a redacted version of Exhibit G. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 4/8/2022. Mailed notice. (exr, )
April 6, 2022 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Thomas More Society by Jonathan Franklin Mitchell (Mitchell, Jonathan)
April 6, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiffs Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity, North Texas Equal Access Fund to seal document Pre-Answer Motion to Seal Exhibit G to Plaintiffs' Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Seal Plaintiffs' Complaint and Permit Plaintiffs to File a Redacted Exhibit G or Replacement Complaint with Redacted Exhibit G, as Appropriate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Lorenc, Susan)
March 25, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 4/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, )
March 24, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity, North Texas Equal Access Fund regarding Summons served on Thomas More Society on 3/21/22 (Moore, Dremain)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Elizabeth G. Myers's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs #6 is granted. John P. Atkins's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs #7 is granted. Jennifer R. Ecklund's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs #8 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 3/23/2022. mailed notice(kl, )
March 21, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19265095. (Ecklund, Jennifer)
March 21, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19265076. (Atkins, John)
March 21, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19264949. (Myers, Elizabeth)
March 18, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Thomas More Society (jk2, )
March 17, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity, North Texas Equal Access Fund by Dremain Taylor Moore (Moore, Dremain)
March 17, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jk2, )
March 17, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, )
March 16, 2022 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity, North Texas Equal Access Fund (Lorenc, Susan)
March 16, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity, North Texas Equal Access Fund by Susan M Lorenc (Lorenc, Susan)
March 16, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lorenc, Susan)
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by North Texas Equal Access Fund, Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19253630. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Lorenc, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Texas Equal Access Fund et al v. Thomas More Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Texas Equal Access Fund
Represented By: Susan M Lorenc
Represented By: Dremain Taylor Moore
Represented By: Elizabeth G. Myers
Represented By: Jennifer R. Ecklund
Represented By: John P. Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity
Represented By: Susan M Lorenc
Represented By: Dremain Taylor Moore
Represented By: Elizabeth G. Myers
Represented By: Jennifer R. Ecklund
Represented By: John P. Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas More Society
Represented By: Jonathan Franklin Mitchell
Represented By: Martin J. Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?