Northern Illinois Gas Company v. General Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Northern Illinois Gas Company doing business as Nicor Gas Company
Defendant: General Casualty Insurance Company and Greenwich Insurance Company
Counter Defendant: Northern Illinois Gas Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv01418
Filed: March 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2022 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the status report, R. 20, the following discovery schedule is set. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures due 05/31/2022. The first round of written discovery requests must be issued by 06/21/2022. Fact discovery must be completed by 10/28/2022. By 09/26/2022, the parties shall file a Deposition Scheduling Report listing the depositions already taken and (more importantly) the remaining deponents, all of whom must have ***confirmed*** deposition dates (not just proposed dates). Any person not on that Report will presumptively not be deposed without good cause (e.g., genuine surprise despite due diligence). If deponents are slow in confirming deposition dates, the parties should use the Report deadline to urge each other and non-parties to provide confirmed dates to avoid a motion to compel in advance of the deadline. Rule 16(b) deadline to amend pleadings or to add parties is set for 08/29/2022. The parties proposed a deadline for after fact discovery, but the Rule 16(b) deadline should be within the fact discovery period so that permitted amendments can be the subject of discovery instead of potentially causing post-amendment discovery. The parties do not anticipate retained-expert discovery. The summary judgment briefing schedule will be set later. **No summary judgment motion may be filed before the close of fact discovery without prior authorization of the Court.** The tracking status hearing of 05/06/2022 is reset to 08/05/2022, but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the parties shall file a discovery progress report by 07/29/2022, by which time written discovery responses should have been exchanged. Emailed notice (mw, )
April 29, 2022 Filing 20 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Northern Illinois Gas Company (Brandt, Philip)
April 25, 2022 Filing 19 General Casualty Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by General Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baniak, Michael)
April 25, 2022 Filing 18 Greenwich Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Relief, Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIM filed by Greenwich Insurance Company against Northern Illinois Gas Company . by Greenwich Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hall, Nathan)
April 18, 2022 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant Greenwich's unopposed extension motion to answer #16 is granted to 04/25/2022. Emailed notice (mw, )
April 14, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Greenwich Insurance Company for extension of time to respond to complaint (Hall, Nathan)
April 14, 2022 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northern Illinois Gas Company (Brandt, Philip)
April 14, 2022 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Northern Illinois Gas Company by Peter George Syregelas (Syregelas, Peter)
April 14, 2022 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Northern Illinois Gas Company by Philip Goodwin Brandt (Brandt, Philip)
April 12, 2022 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Greenwich Insurance Company (Hall, Nathan)
March 25, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Greenwich Insurance Company by Stephan Hoffman (Hoffman, Stephan)
March 25, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Greenwich Insurance Company by Nathan Andrew Hall (Hall, Nathan)
March 25, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Greenwich Insurance Company by Jack C. Hsu (Hsu, Jack)
March 24, 2022 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The unopposed defense extension motion #7 to answer or to respond to the complaint is granted to 04/25/2022. The tracking status hearing of 04/08/2022 is reset to 05/06/2022 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the parties shall file the joint initial status report, R. #6 -1, by 04/29/2022. Mailed notice (ags)
March 23, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant General Casualty Insurance Company for extension of time DEFENDANT GENERAL CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD (Baniak, Michael)
March 21, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial tracking status hearing set for 04/08/2022 at 8:30 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will set the case schedule after reviewing the written status report. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 04/01/2022. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendant has not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If Defendant has not been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, )
March 18, 2022 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (exr, )
March 17, 2022 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by General Casualty Insurance Company (Baniak, Michael)
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant General Casualty Insurance Company by Michael Paul Baniak (Baniak, Michael)
March 17, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Baniak, Michael)
March 17, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Winnebago County, case number (2022 MR 0000058) filed by General Casualty Insurance Company Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19256914. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baniak, Michael)
March 17, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, )
March 17, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jk2, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern Illinois Gas Company v. General Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Illinois Gas Company doing business as Nicor Gas Company
Represented By: Peter George Syregelas
Represented By: Philip Goodwin Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Paul Baniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwich Insurance Company
Represented By: Jack C. Hsu
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Hall
Represented By: Stephan Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Northern Illinois Gas Company
Represented By: Peter George Syregelas
Represented By: Philip Goodwin Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?