Williams et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Bernadette Williams, Rick McConnell, Rosilyn Wilson, Linda Lewis, Latasha Huff, Haunanimae Cervantes-White, Maria Munoz, Kimberly Benson, Roy Tuinstra, Evelyn Brown, Michelle Snyder, William Ross Dean, Richard Dacheff, Diane Newkirk, Sandra Smiling, Shaun Robert, Roque Espinoza, Jennifer Payne, Latishia Bowden and DJ Neill
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv01422
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE by Kimberly Benson, Latishia Bowden, Evelyn Brown, Haunanimae Cervantes-White, Richard Dacheff, Roque Espinoza, Latasha Huff, Linda Lewis, Rick McConnell, Maria Munoz, DJ Neill, Diane Newkirk, Jennifer Payne, Shaun Robert, William Ross Dean, Sandra Smiling, Michelle Snyder, Roy Tuinstra, Bernadette Williams, Rosilyn Wilsonin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company to stay and for an immediate case management conference #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shamis, Andrew)
May 4, 2022 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kimberly Benson, Latishia Bowden, Evelyn Brown, Haunanimae Cervantes-White, Richard Dacheff, Roque Espinoza, Latasha Huff, Linda Lewis, Rick McConnell, Maria Munoz, DJ Neill, Diane Newkirk, Jennifer Payne, Shaun Robert, William Ross Dean, Sandra Smiling, Michelle Snyder, Roy Tuinstra, Bernadette Williams, Rosilyn Wilson by Chris Gold (Gold, Chris)
April 26, 2022 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kimberly Benson, Latishia Bowden, Evelyn Brown, Haunanimae Cervantes-White, Richard Dacheff, Roque Espinoza, Latasha Huff, Linda Lewis, Rick McConnell, Maria Munoz, DJ Neill, Diane Newkirk, Jennifer Payne, Shaun Robert, William Ross Dean, Sandra Smiling, Michelle Snyder, Roy Tuinstra, Bernadette Williams, Rosilyn Wilson by Scott A. George (George, Scott)
April 26, 2022 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorney Christopher Ayers's Motion to appear pro hac vice #16 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
April 26, 2022 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion hearing held on 4/26/2022 via Webex regarding Motion to stay #11 . Oral argument heard regarding Motion to stay #11 . Response regarding Motion to stay #11 shall be filed by 5/10/2022; Reply due by 5/17/2022. Webex Status hearing set for 6/30/2022 at 9:15 AM. Prior to the hearing, you are directed to cut and paste this hyper link into a browser: https://us-courts.webex.com/join/virginia_kendallilnd.uscourts.gov If you do not have access to a device with video capability, please use the dial in option: (650)-479-3207, the access code is: 180 698 4009. If you do have access to a device with video capability, you are directed to appear via video. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone and turn off your video until your case is called. If calling in due to not having access to a computer, please remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function. Case is temporarily stayed pending ruling on Motion to Stay. Mailed notice (lk, )
April 26, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19375824. (Ayers, Christopher)
April 25, 2022 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kimberly Benson, Latishia Bowden, Evelyn Brown, Haunanimae Cervantes-White, Richard Dacheff, Roque Espinoza, Latasha Huff, Linda Lewis, Rick McConnell, Maria Munoz, DJ Neill, Diane Newkirk, Jennifer Payne, Shaun Robert, William Ross Dean, Sandra Smiling, Michelle Snyder, Roy Tuinstra, Bernadette Williams, Rosilyn Wilson by Scott Edelsberg (Edelsberg, Scott)
April 21, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion hearing set for 4/26/2022 at 9:00 AM stands and will proceed via Webex. Prior to the hearing, you are directed to cut and paste this hyper link into a browser: https://us-courts.webex.com/join/virginia_kendallilnd.uscourts.gov If you do not have access to a device with video capability, please use the dial in option: (650)-479-3207, the access code is: 180 698 4009. If you do have access to a device with video capability, you are directed to appear via video. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone and turn off your video until your case is called. If calling in due to not having access to a computer, please remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function. Please test the sound quality and video functions of your device in advance. Members of the public and media are directed to call in to listen to hearings. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Participant instructions for Webex are attached. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Webex Participant Instructions) (lk, )
April 20, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph P. Carlasare for presentment of motion to stay #11 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/26/2022 at 09:00 AM. (Carlasare, Joseph)
April 20, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in support of motion to stay #11 (Carlasare, Joseph)
April 20, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company to stay and for an immediate case management conference (Carlasare, Joseph)
April 18, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorney Eric Robertson's Motion to appear pro hac vice #8 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
April 14, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Motion for extension of time to answer #5 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 5/18/2022. The motion hearing set for 4/14/2022 is stricken. Mailed notice (ags)
April 12, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19337498. (Robertson, Eric)
April 11, 2022 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company by Joseph P. Carlasare (Carlasare, Joseph)
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Peter W. Herzog, III for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #5 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/14/2022 at 09:00 AM. (Herzog, Peter)
April 8, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint,, #1 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Herzog, Peter)
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Snyder, Maria Munoz, Rick McConnell, Roque Espinoza, Bernadette Williams, Jennifer Payne, Shaun Robert, Richard Dacheff, Haunanimae Cervantes-White, Rosilyn Wilson, Roy Tuinstra, William Ross Dean, DJ Neill, Diane Newkirk, Sandra Smiling, Kimberly Benson, Linda Lewis, Evelyn Brown, Latishia Bowden, Latasha Huff as to All Defendants. (Shamis, Andrew)
March 24, 2022 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial Status hearing set for 6/15/2022 at 9:00 AM which will proceed via Webex. Joint Status Report due by 6/9/2022. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Webex instructions are as follows: Prior to the hearing, you are directed to cut and paste this hyper link into a browser: https://us-courts.webex.com/join/virginia_kendallilnd.uscourts.gov. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (650)-479-3207, the access code is: 180 698 4009. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone and turn off your video until your case is called. If calling in due to not having access to a computer, please remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function. Please test the sound quality and video functions of your device in advance. Members of the public and media are directed to call in to listen to hearings. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Participant instructions for Webex are attached. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Webex Participant Instructions) (lk, )
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kimberly Benson, Latishia Bowden, Evelyn Brown, Haunanimae Cervantes-White, Richard Dacheff, Roque Espinoza, Latasha Huff, Linda Lewis, Rick McConnell, Maria Munoz, DJ Neill, Diane Newkirk, Jennifer Payne, Shaun Robert, William Ross Dean, Sandra Smiling, Michelle Snyder, Roy Tuinstra, Bernadette Williams, Rosilyn Wilson by Andrew Shamis (Shamis, Andrew)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michelle Snyder, Maria Munoz, Rick McConnell, Roque Espinoza, Bernadette Williams, Jennifer Payne, Shaun Robert, Richard Dacheff, Haunanimae Cervantes-White, Rosilyn Wilson, Roy Tuinstra, William Ross Dean, DJ Neill, Diane Newkirk, Sandra Smiling, Kimberly Benson, Linda Lewis, Evelyn Brown, Latishia Bowden, Latasha Huff; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19258362. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Policies, #2 Exhibit 2- Settlement Agreements, #3 Exhibit 3-22- Market Valuation Reports, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shamis, Andrew)
March 18, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jk2, )
March 18, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (jk2, )
March 18, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Williams
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick McConnell
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosilyn Wilson
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lewis
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Huff
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haunanimae Cervantes-White
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Munoz
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Benson
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Tuinstra
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Brown
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Snyder
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ross Dean
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dacheff
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Newkirk
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Smiling
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Robert
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roque Espinoza
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Payne
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latishia Bowden
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DJ Neill
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Chris Gold
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Scott Edelsberg
Represented By: Scott A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph P. Carlasare
Represented By: Eric L Robertson
Represented By: Peter W. Herzog, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?