Phan v. Department of Homeland Security, The et al
Plaintiff: My Thi Phan
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security, The, USCIS, Secretary of the DHS ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, MENDOZA UR JADDOU, Kevin Riddle, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou and Attorney General - Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2022cv01604
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1156 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the status report, R. 12, and given the answer deadline of 06/13/2022, the tracking status hearing of 05/20/2022 is reset to 06/24/2022 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the parties shall file an updated status report with a proposed discovery schedule (if applicable) by 06/15/2022. Emailed notice (mw, )
May 13, 2022 Filing 12 STATUS Report (Joint Initial) by My Thi Phan (Gambacorta, Timothy)
April 22, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by My Thi Phan as to Alejandro Mayorkas on 4/13/2022, answer due 5/4/2022; U.S. Department of Homeland Security on 4/13/2022, answer due 5/4/2022. (Gambacorta, Timothy)
April 22, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by My Thi Phan as to Attorney General - Department of Justice on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/5/2022. (Gambacorta, Timothy)
April 13, 2022 Filing 9 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Kevin Riddle, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Treacy, Elizabeth)
April 13, 2022 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Kevin Riddle, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Oswald, Craig)
April 13, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by My Thi Phan as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services on 4/12/2022, answer due 5/3/2022; U.S. Department of Homeland Security on 4/12/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Gambacorta, Timothy)
April 4, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial tracking status hearing set for 05/20/2022 at 8:30 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will set the case schedule after reviewing the written status report. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 05/13/2022. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendant has not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If not all Defendants have been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel (or the parties, if proceeding pro se) must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel (or the party, if proceeding pro se) must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, )
March 30, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (ak, )
March 29, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff My Thi Phan (Gambacorta, Timothy)
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 Plaintiff's AMENDED complaint by My Thi Phan against All Defendants The Department of Homeland Security. et al (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy Manual, #2 Exhibit Medical Disability Policy Manual, #3 Exhibit Copy of I-551, #4 Exhibit April 3 2019 N-648, #5 Exhibit August 30 2019 Notice of Continuance, #6 Exhibit August 19 2019 N-648, #7 Exhibit March 7, 2021 N-648, #8 Exhibit July 27 2021 N-400 Denial, #9 Exhibit September 21, 2021 N-648, #10 Exhibit December 14, 2021 N-336 Legal Memo, #11 Exhibit December 29, 2021 N-336 Denial)(Gambacorta, Timothy)
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff My Thi Phan by Timothy A. Gambacorta (Gambacorta, Timothy)
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gambacorta, Timothy)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by My Thi Phan; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19287726.(Gambacorta, Timothy)
March 28, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, )
March 28, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phan v. Department of Homeland Security, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: My Thi Phan
Represented By: Timothy A. Gambacorta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the DHS ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENDOZA UR JADDOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Riddle
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General - Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?