Bock v. WLCC Lending, FDL
Plaintiff: Michael Bock
Defendant: WLCC Lending, FDL d/b/a First Day Loans, Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation, Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation II d/b/a WLCC II, Geneva Lone Hill, Brett A. Crandall, III, Raycen Raines, III, John Does 1-20, WLCC Lending, FDL doing business as First Day Loans, Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation II doing business as WLCC II, Raycen American Homes Raines and Raycen Ballard
Case Number: 1:2022cv01758
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be served by 6/15/2022. Written discovery requests shall be served by 7/29/2022. Class certification motion shall be filed by 11/18/2022. Motions to amend the pleadings and add new parties shall be filed by 12/23/2022. Fact discovery shall be completed by 3/31/2023. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 5/1/2023. The status hearing set for 6/7/2022 #6 is stricken and re-set for 9/20/2022 at 9:00 a.m. By 9/13/2022, the parties shall file a joint status report addressing: (1) the discovery they have completed; (2) the discovery that remains to be taken; (3) any foreseeable obstacles to meeting the deadlines set forth in this order; (4) whether both sides would like a settlement conference with the Magistrate Judge; and (5) whether there is a need for the 9/20/2022 status hearing. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 16 STATUS Report JOINT Initial Status Report by Michael Bock (Goldstein, Matthew)
May 11, 2022 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time #9 is granted. The deadline for Defendant Crandall to file a responsive pleading is extended to 7/5/2022.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 10, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Bock. WLCC Lending, FDL waiver sent on 5/5/2022, answer due 7/4/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
May 10, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Bock. Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation II waiver sent on 5/5/2022, answer due 7/4/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
May 10, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Bock. Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation waiver sent on 5/5/2022, answer due 7/4/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
May 10, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Bock. Raycen Raines, III waiver sent on 5/5/2022, answer due 7/4/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
May 10, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Bock. Geneva Lone Hill waiver sent on 5/5/2022, answer due 7/4/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
May 10, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants Brett A. Crandall, III, Geneva Lone Hill, Raycen Raines, III, WLCC Lending, FDL, Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation, Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation II for extension of time Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Waltz, Daniel)
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Brett A. Crandall, III, Geneva Lone Hill, Raycen Raines, III, WLCC Lending, FDL, Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation, Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation II by Daniel Robert Waltz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Waltz, Daniel)
May 9, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bock as to Brett A. Crandall, III on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
May 6, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Due to the schedule of this Court, the status hearing set for 6/8/2022 #5 is stricken and re-set for 6/7/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 12, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Initial status hearing set for 6/8/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 6/1/2022. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report.Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 8, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Brett A. Crandall, III, Geneva Lone Hill, Raycen Raines, III, WLCC Lending, FDL, Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation, Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation II (jk2, )
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Bock by Matthew J. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew)
April 5, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Bock by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
April 5, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Bock by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
April 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action filed by Michael Bock; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19314643. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Edelman, Daniel)
April 5, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ak, )
April 5, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bock v. WLCC Lending, FDL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bock
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WLCC Lending, FDL d/b/a First Day Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Robert Waltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation II d/b/a WLCC II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geneva Lone Hill
Represented By: Daniel Robert Waltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett A. Crandall, III
Represented By: Daniel Robert Waltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raycen Raines, III
Represented By: Daniel Robert Waltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WLCC Lending, FDL doing business as First Day Loans
Represented By: Daniel Robert Waltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation II doing business as WLCC II
Represented By: Daniel Robert Waltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raycen American Homes Raines
Represented By: Daniel Robert Waltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raycen Ballard
Represented By: Daniel Robert Waltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?