Mogenson v. DCO LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eva T. Mogenson
Defendant: DCO LLC f/k/a Dana Companies, LLC, MW Custom Papers, LLC as Successor in Interest to The Mead Corporation, Navistor, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, DCO LLC, Dana Companies, LLC and MW Custom Papers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv01962
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Eva T. Mogenson Plaintiff's Reply to MW Custom Papers, LLC's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Campbell, James)
May 26, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE by MW Custom Papers, LLC to MOTION by Plaintiff Eva T. Mogenson to remand #15 (Clapper, Kyle)
May 13, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff Eva T. Mogenson to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Campbell, James)
May 12, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff's motion to postpone status hearing #13 is granted as follows. Plaintiff has advised the Court of her intent to file a motion for remand by 5/13/2022. The Court sets the following schedule on the anticipated motion: Defendants shall respond by 5/27/2022 and Plaintiff shall reply by 6/6/2022. Telephonic initial status hearing set for 5/19/2022 is stricken and reset for 7/19/2022 at 9:15 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, )
May 11, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Eva T. Mogenson to reset Hearing (Campbell, James)
April 26, 2022 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Union Carbide Corporation (Union Carbide Corporation's Notification of Affiliates) (Koontz, Scott)
April 26, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Union Carbide Corporation's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint) by Union Carbide Corporation(Koontz, Scott)
April 22, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic initial status hearing set for 5/19/2022 at 9:30 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, )
April 21, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation by Scott H. Koontz (Koontz, Scott)
April 21, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation by Jacob D. Sawyer (Sawyer, Jacob)
April 19, 2022 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel, James Campbell, and Nate Mudd. (jh, )
April 15, 2022 Filing 6 EXHIBIT by Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC as Successor in Interest to The Mead Corporation regarding notice of removal, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5)(Clapper, Kyle)
April 15, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC as Successor in Interest to The Mead Corporation by Adam J Jagadich (Jagadich, Adam)
April 15, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC as Successor in Interest to The Mead Corporation by Kyle R Clapper (Clapper, Kyle)
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by MW Custom Papers, LLC as Successor in Interest to The Mead Corporation (Clapper, Kyle)
April 15, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Clapper, Kyle)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Circuit Court of Illinois, case number (2021-L-001498) filed by MW Custom Papers, LLC as Successor in Interest to The Mead Corporation Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19349263. (Clapper, Kyle)
April 15, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cxr, )
April 15, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cxr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mogenson v. DCO LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva T. Mogenson
Represented By: James Campbell
Represented By: Nate Mudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCO LLC f/k/a Dana Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MW Custom Papers, LLC as Successor in Interest to The Mead Corporation
Represented By: Adam J Jagadich
Represented By: Kyle R Clapper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Jacob D. Sawyer
Represented By: Scott H. Koontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MW Custom Papers, LLC
Represented By: Adam J Jagadich
Represented By: Kyle R Clapper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?