Nasir v. Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Plaintiff: Muhammad Nasir, US Secretary of State Antony Blinken, Donald Blome US Ambassador to Pakistan, Angela Aggler Islamabad Embassy and Richard Visek US Department of State
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Embassy-Islamabad Pakistan, Anthony Blinken, U.S. Consul General Donald Blome, Angela Aggler and Richard Visek
Case Number: 1:2022cv02696
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the representations in the parties' 7/8/22 status report #13 , Defendants shall respond to the complaint by 8/22/22. The parties shall file an updated status report by 8/31/22 confirming that the certified administrative record either has been filed or will be filed by a date certain. Plaintiff shall also indicate whether he requires discovery beyond the administrative record and, if so, explain what discovery he requires. Mailed notice (gel, )
July 8, 2022 Filing 13 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Muhammad Nasir (Passo, Alexander)
June 28, 2022 Filing 12 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Angela Aggler, Anthony Blinken, Donald Blome, Department of Homeland Security, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Embassy-Islamabad Pakistan, Richard Visek (Treacy, Elizabeth)
June 28, 2022 Filing 11 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Angela Aggler, Anthony Blinken, Donald Blome, Department of Homeland Security, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Embassy-Islamabad Pakistan, Richard Visek (Oswald, Craig)
June 26, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Muhammad Nasir as to US Embassy-Islamabad Pakistan on 6/20/2022. (Passo, Alexander)
June 26, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Muhammad Nasir as to US Citizenship and Immigration Services on 6/21/2022. (Passo, Alexander)
June 26, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Muhammad Nasir as to Anthony Blinken on 6/21/2022. (Passo, Alexander)
June 26, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Muhammad Nasir as to Richard Visek on 6/21/2022. (Passo, Alexander)
June 26, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Muhammad Nasir as to Donald Blome on 6/21/2022. (Passo, Alexander)
June 26, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Muhammad Nasir as to Department of Homeland Security on 6/21/2022. (Passo, Alexander)
June 26, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Muhammad Nasir as to Angela Aggler on 6/21/2002. (Passo, Alexander)
June 15, 2022 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant US Embassy-Islamabad Pakistan. (khg, )
June 14, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Angela Aggler(2 summons and 2 addresses), Anthony Blinken(2 summons and 2 addresses), Donald Blome(2 summons and 2 addresses), Department of Homeland Security(2 summons and 2 addresses), US Citizenship and Immigration Services(2 summons and 2 addresses), US Embassy-Islamabad Pakistan, Richard Visek(2 summons and 2 addresses), U.S. Attorney(khg, )
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 7/8/2022, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 23, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Passo, Alexander)
May 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Muhammad Nasir; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19490666.(Passo, Alexander)
May 23, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, )
May 23, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jk2, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nasir v. Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Nasir
Represented By: Alexander Isaac Ernst Passo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Secretary of State Antony Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Blome US Ambassador to Pakistan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Aggler Islamabad Embassy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Visek US Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Embassy-Islamabad Pakistan
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Blinken
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Consul General Donald Blome
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Aggler
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Visek
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?