25 Western Avenue LLC v. Lester et al
Plaintiff: 25 Western Avenue LLC
Defendant: Eric Lester, Warren Forsythe, Re No. One, LLC, Starcorp, LLC, Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2022cv02697
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Re No. One, LLC (McDonell, Thomas)
July 7, 2022 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Starcorp, LLC (McDonell, Thomas)
July 5, 2022 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' unopposed motion for an initial extension of time to file a responsive answer #16 is granted to 8/1/22. Motion hearing date of 7/7/22 is stricken. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
July 1, 2022 Filing 17 (UNOPPOSED motion) NOTICE of Motion by Thomas James McDonell for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #16 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/7/2022 at 10:30 AM. (McDonell, Thomas)
July 1, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants Warren Forsythe, Eric Lester, Re No. One, LLC, Starcorp, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (UNOPPOSED Motion) (McDonell, Thomas)
July 1, 2022 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Warren Forsythe, Eric Lester, Re No. One, LLC, Starcorp, LLC by Thomas James McDonell (McDonell, Thomas)
July 1, 2022 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Warren Forsythe, Eric Lester, Re No. One, LLC, Starcorp, LLC by Charles E. Harper, Jr (Harper, Charles)
June 27, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant'sMotion for extension of time to answer #10 is granted to 8/1/22. Telephonic Status hearing set for 8/9/22 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 8/4/22. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
June 23, 2022 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. (Corbett, Ross)
June 23, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Ross Jacob Corbett for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 6/28/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Corbett, Ross)
June 23, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Agreed Motion) (Corbett, Ross)
June 23, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. by Ross Jacob Corbett (Corbett, Ross)
June 23, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 25 Western Avenue LLC as to Warren Forsythe on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #2 Notice of Filing, #3 Certificate of Service)(Schwartz, Marty)
June 23, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 25 Western Avenue LLC as to Eric Lester on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #2 Notice of Filing, #3 Certificate of Service)(Schwartz, Marty)
June 23, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 25 Western Avenue LLC as to Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc. on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #2 Notice of Filing, #3 Certificate of Service)(Schwartz, Marty)
June 23, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 25 Western Avenue LLC as to Re No. One, LLC on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #2 Notice of Filing, #3 Certificate of Service)(Schwartz, Marty)
June 23, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 25 Western Avenue LLC as to Starcorp, LLC on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #2 Notice of Filing, #3 Certificate of Service)(Schwartz, Marty)
June 8, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Warren Forsythe, Eric Lester, Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc., Re No. One, LLC, Starcorp, LLC (emc, )
May 24, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schwartz, Marty)
May 24, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ey, )
May 24, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ey, )
May 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 25 Western Avenue LLC (Schwartz, Marty)
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by 25 Western Avenue LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19489724. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Schwartz, Marty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 25 Western Avenue LLC v. Lester et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 25 Western Avenue LLC
Represented By: Marty Jay Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Lester
Represented By: Charles E. Harper, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas James McDonell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Forsythe
Represented By: Charles E. Harper, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas James McDonell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Re No. One, LLC
Represented By: Charles E. Harper, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas James McDonell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starcorp, LLC
Represented By: Charles E. Harper, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas James McDonell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthews Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ross Jacob Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?