Traub et al v. Jayco, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jonathon Traub, Margaret Traub and Jonathon S. Traub
Defendant: Jayco, Inc., Jayco, Inc. of Indiana, Entegra Coach, Inc. and General R.V. Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02788
Filed: May 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 7/15/2022: For the reasons set forth in the Statement below, the defendants' motion to transfer #11 is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division, and to terminate the case on this Court's docket. (For further details see order) Mailed notice(air, )
July 13, 2022 Filing 15 REPLY by Entegra Coach, Inc., General R.V. Center, Inc., Jayco, Inc., Jayco, Inc. of Indiana to MOTION by Defendants Entegra Coach, Inc., General R.V. Center, Inc., Jayco, Inc., Jayco, Inc. of Indiana to transfer case and Memorandum in Support #11 (Venard, Daniel)
July 11, 2022 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jonathon S. Traub, Jonathon S. Traub, Jonathon S. Traub, Jonathon S. Traub, Jonathon S. Traub, Margaret Traub by Mark T. Schneid (Schneid, Mark)
July 11, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Jonathon S. Traub(as Father and Next Friend of M.T., a minor)in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Entegra Coach, Inc., General R.V. Center, Inc., Jayco, Inc., Jayco, Inc. of Indiana to transfer case and Memorandum in Support #11 (Schneid, Mark)
June 24, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The defendant's motion for transfer #11 is taken under advisement. The plaintiff's response is due by 07/06/2022; the defendant's reply is due by 07/13/2022. Mailed notice (air, )
June 24, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendants Entegra Coach, Inc., General R.V. Center, Inc., Jayco, Inc., Jayco, Inc. of Indiana to transfer case and Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jim Izbicki, #2 Exhibit 1 - Warranty, #3 Exhibit 2 - Delivery form)(Venard, Daniel)
June 24, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Entegra Coach, Inc., General R.V. Center, Inc., Jayco, Inc., Jayco, Inc. of Indiana (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Warranty)(Venard, Daniel)
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The defendant's uncontested motion for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading #8 is granted. The defendant's responsive pleading is due by 06/24/2022.Mailed notice (air, )
June 10, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants Entegra Coach, Inc., General R.V. Center, Inc., Jayco, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Venard, Daniel)
June 10, 2022 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant General R.V. Center, Inc. by Daniel James Venard (Venard, Daniel)
May 27, 2022 Filing 6 Consent to Removal (General R.V. Center, Inc.) by Jayco, Inc. (Venard, Daniel)
May 27, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jayco, Inc. (Venard, Daniel)
May 27, 2022 Filing 4 MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (ph, )
May 26, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Entegra Coach, Inc., Jayco, Inc. by Daniel James Venard (Venard, Daniel)
May 26, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Venard, Daniel)
May 26, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Circuit Court, Law Division, case number (2022L003788) filed by Entegra Coach, Inc., Jayco, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19506442. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dockets, #2 Exhibit B - Certification of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration)(Venard, Daniel)
May 26, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jk2, )
May 26, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Traub et al v. Jayco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Traub
Represented By: Mark T. Schneid
Represented By: Daniel Ramon Chaidez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon S. Traub
Represented By: Mark T. Schneid
Represented By: Daniel Ramon Chaidez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayco, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel James Venard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayco, Inc. of Indiana
Represented By: Daniel James Venard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entegra Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel James Venard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General R.V. Center, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel James Venard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?