SPM Capital Holdings, LLC v. Perry et al
Plaintiff: SPM Capital Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Young Freeman Perry, Hanover Asset Holdings, LLC, Kevin T. Carias, Kristina M. Gilbertson, Gleason & Koatz, LLP, Lissimore & Lissimore, Inc. and Freeman Young Perry
Case Number: 1:2022cv02854
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff SPM Capital Holdings, LLCLeave to Serve Defendant by Email (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Irion, Susan)
July 29, 2022 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by SPM Capital Holdings, LLC as to Kristina M. Gilbertson. (LUBIN, PETER)
July 29, 2022 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by SPM Capital Holdings, LLC as to Young Freeman Perry. (LUBIN, PETER)
July 29, 2022 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Kristina M. Gilbertson. (lm, London)
July 20, 2022 Filing 22 Regarding Motion for Extension of Time STATEMENT by Kevin T. Carias (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Grosh, Katherine)
July 18, 2022 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Before the Court is Defendant Lissimore & Lissimore, Inc.'s pro se motion for continuance #12 . Defendant Lissimore & Lissimore reports that "[t]he parties are undergoing alternative dispute resolution through negotiation" and requests that the case "be continued [until] the negotiation process is concluded." As a corporate entity, however, Defendant Lissimore & Lissimore cannot appear pro se. See Scandia Down Corp. v. Euroquilt, Inc., 772 F.2d 1423, 1427 (7th Cir. 1985) ("corporations must appear by counsel or not at all"); see also L.R.83.12(a) ("only members in good standing of the general bar of this Court may enter an appearance on behalf of a party; file pleadings, motions or other documents; sign stipulations; or receive payments upon judgments, decrees or orders"). Accordingly, Defendant Lissimore & Lissimore's pro se motion #12 is stricken. If Defendant Lissimore & Lissimore wishes to refile a motion, it may only do so through counsel. Also before the Court is Defendant Gleason & Koatz's agreed motion #16 for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead. Like other motions on this docket, Defendant Gleason & Koatz's motion is accompanied by a "notice of motion" #17 . Defendant Gleason & Koatz's agreed motion #16 is granted, but the parties are directed to review Judge Kness's motions policy before filing motions, which is available on the Court's webpage. Finally, Defendant Kevin T. Carias's motion #20 for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead is entered and continued. Defendant Carias must also review the Court's motions policy (available on Judge Kness's Court webpage), which requires that all motions reflect whether they are agreed or opposed. Defendant Carias must file a statement on or before 7/22/2022 stating whether the motion #20 for an extension is agreed or opposed. If no statement is filed by the deadline, the Court will strike the motion. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 15, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant Kevin T. Carias for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Grosh, Katherine)
July 15, 2022 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kevin T. Carias by Katherine A. Grosh (Grosh, Katherine)
July 14, 2022 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kevin T. Carias by Howard L. Teplinsky (Teplinsky, Howard)
July 8, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Danielle N Malaty for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #16 before Honorable John F. Kness on 7/11/2022 at 10:00 AM. (Malaty, Danielle)
July 8, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Gleason & Koatz, LLP for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (AGREED) (Malaty, Danielle)
July 8, 2022 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Gleason & Koatz, LLP by Danielle N Malaty (Malaty, Danielle)
July 5, 2022 Filing 14 LETTER from Lissimore-Lissimore dated 7/1/2022. (jmk, )
July 5, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Lissimore & Lissimore, Inc #12 . (jmk, )
July 5, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Continuance by Defendant Lissimore & Lissimore, Inc. (jmk, )
June 23, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SPM Capital Holdings, LLC as to Lissimore & Lissimore, Inc. on 6/16/2022, answer due 7/7/2022. (LUBIN, PETER)
June 23, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SPM Capital Holdings, LLC as to Gleason & Koatz, LLP on 6/17/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. (LUBIN, PETER)
June 23, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SPM Capital Holdings, LLC as to Kevin T. Carias on 6/14/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. (LUBIN, PETER)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 6/16/2022: Telephonic initial status hearing is set for 8/15/2022 at 9:30 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than ten days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice(ef, )
June 16, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Gleason & Koatz, LLP (emc, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SPM Capital Holdings, LLC as to Hanover Asset Holdings, LLC on 6/15/2022, answer due 7/6/2022. (LUBIN, PETER)
June 13, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Kevin T. Carias, Kristina M. Gilbertson, Gleason & Koatz, LLP, Hanover Asset Holdings, LLC, Lissimore & Lissimore, Inc., Young Freeman Perry (khg, )
June 1, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (emc, )
June 1, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (emc, )
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SPM Capital Holdings, LLC by Susan Irion (Irion, Susan)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SPM Capital Holdings, LLC by Patrick Doyle Austermuehle (Austermuehle, Patrick)
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SPM Capital Holdings, LLC by PETER S. LUBIN (LUBIN, PETER)
May 31, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SPM Capital Holdings, LLC by Terrence Buehler (Buehler, Terrence)
May 31, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Buehler, Terrence)
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by SPM Capital Holdings, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19517093.(Buehler, Terrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPM Capital Holdings, LLC v. Perry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPM Capital Holdings, LLC
Represented By: PETER S. LUBIN
Represented By: Patrick Doyle Austermuehle
Represented By: Susan Irion
Represented By: Terrence Buehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Freeman Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Asset Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin T. Carias
Represented By: Howard L. Teplinsky
Represented By: Katherine A. Grosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina M. Gilbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gleason & Koatz, LLP
Represented By: Danielle N Malaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lissimore & Lissimore, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman Young Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?