Peanuts Worldwide LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associates Identified on Schedule A
Plaintiff: Peanuts Worldwide LLC
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associates Identified on Schedule A and MRSP002
Case Number: 1:2022cv03383
Filed: June 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2022 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Attorney Isaku M. Begert's motion to withdraw #38 is granted. His appearance on the record is terminated. Mailed notice (air, )
August 23, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION by Attorney Isaku M. Begert to withdraw as attorney for Peanuts Worldwide LLC. No party information provided (Begert, Isaku)
August 23, 2022 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #36 , defendants Aschar and CHZSRX are dismissed from this case.Mailed notice (air, )
August 19, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Peanuts Worldwide LLC as to certain defendants (Begert, Isaku)
August 11, 2022 Filing 35 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (jh, )
August 11, 2022 Filing 34 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jh, )
August 9, 2022 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #32 , defendant MRSP002 is dismissed from this case. Mailed notice (air, )
August 5, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Peanuts Worldwide LLC as to a certain defendant (Begert, Isaku)
August 2, 2022 Filing 31 PRELIMINARY Injunction Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 8/2/2022. Mailed notice(air, )
August 2, 2022 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: On the grounds set forth in the motion, plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #27 is granted. Enter preliminary injunction order. Mailed notice (air, )
July 27, 2022 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peanuts Worldwide LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associates Identified on Schedule A on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marcella D. Slay, #2 Exhibit A)(Slay, Marcella)
July 27, 2022 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by Peanuts Worldwide LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #27 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Isaku M. Begert, #2 Exhibit 1)(Begert, Isaku)
July 27, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION by Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Begert, Isaku)
July 18, 2022 Filing 26 EXTENSION of Temporary Restraining Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 7/18/2022:Mailed notice(air, )
July 18, 2022 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiff's motion to extend the temporary restraining order #23 is granted. Enter order. Mailed notice (air, )
July 15, 2022 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by Peanuts Worldwide LLC in support of extension of time #23 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Isaku M. Begert)(Begert, Isaku)
July 15, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Begert, Isaku)
July 12, 2022 Filing 22 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 168,000.00 posted by Peanuts Worldwide LLC. (Document not scanned) (ph, )
July 7, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associates Identified on Schedule A (emc, )
July 5, 2022 Filing 21 SEALED Temporary Restraining Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 7/5/2022. Mailed notice(air, )
July 5, 2022 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:On the grounds set forth in the motion, plaintiff's ex parte motion for TRO #12 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process #17 is granted. Enter temporary restraining order. Mailed notice (air, )
July 1, 2022 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Peanuts Worldwide LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #17 (Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLCfor Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2022 Filing 16 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC Exhibit 4 - Parts 1 - 7 regarding declaration #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-1, #2 Exhibit 4-2, #3 Exhibit 4-3, #4 Exhibit 4-4, #5 Exhibit 4-5, #6 Exhibit 4-6, #7 Exhibit 4-7)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2022 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Carrie J. Dumont regarding memorandum in support of motion #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2022 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2022 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Peanuts Worldwide LLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order #12 (Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
June 30, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #3 is granted. Mailed notice (air, )
June 28, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC by Marcella Deshonda Slay (Slay, Marcella)
June 28, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC by Isaku Begert (Begert, Isaku)
June 28, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
June 28, 2022 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
June 28, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Peanuts Worldwide LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
June 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Peanuts Worldwide LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
June 28, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
June 28, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION by Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
June 28, 2022 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Peanuts Worldwide LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
June 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Peanuts Worldwide LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19603534. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Gaudio, Justin)
June 28, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jg, )
June 28, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peanuts Worldwide LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associates Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peanuts Worldwide LLC
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Isaku Begert
Represented By: Marcella Deshonda Slay
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associates Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRSP002
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?