Trimuel v. Chicago Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Vinzella Trimuel
Defendant: Attorney Chicago Housing Authority and Chicago Housing Authority
Case Number: 1:2022cv03422
Filed: June 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vinzella Trimuel by Jaclyn Zarack Koriath (Koriath, Jaclyn)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion for extension of time to file responsive pleading #14 is granted and any responsive pleading shall be filed on or before 9/15/2022. If the parties want a referral to the Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference, then they should email this Court's Courtroom Deputy. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STATUS Report Joint by Vinzella Trimuel (Quarfoot, Daniel)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vinzella Trimuel by Daniel Quarfoot /Jaclyn Zarack Koriath (Quarfoot, Daniel)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Chicago Housing Authority for extension of time TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING (Smith, Ryan)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Plaintiff's Third AMENDED complaint by Vinzella Trimuel against All Defendants Chicago Housing Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5)(Quarfoot, Daniel)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's motion to dismiss #10 . Plaintiff is advised to review the Court's Standing Order on Motions to Dismiss, which is available on the Court's homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Consistent with the purpose of the Federal Rules "to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, this Court's Standing Order requires Plaintiff to make an election as to whether Plaintiff will amend the complaint under Rule 15(a)(1), or stand on the current complaint and proceed with briefing on the motion to dismiss. To this end, Plaintiff shall file either: (1) an amended complaint within the time limit set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B) by 8/4/2022 or (2) a response to the motion to dismiss by 8/11/2022. If Plaintiff files a response, Defendant shall file a reply by 8/25/2022. If Plaintiff elects to amend its pleading in response to the motion to dismiss, then Defendant shall file within 21 days of the amended pleading either: (1) an answer; or (2) a revised motion to dismiss. Mailed notice (gel, )
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM motion to dismiss #10 by Chicago Housing Authority (Smith, Ryan)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Chicago Housing Authority to dismiss (Smith, Ryan)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chicago Housing Authority by Ryan Edward Smith (Smith, Ryan)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's uncontested motion for extension of time to file response/reply #7 is granted and any reply shall be filed on or before 7/14/2022. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 8/22/2021, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Chicago Housing Authority for extension of time to file response/reply (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Kumar, Sunil)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Chicago Volunteer Legal Services. (daj, )
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ey, )
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ey, )
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Harris, Cynthia)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chicago Housing Authority by Sunil Kumar (Kumar, Sunil)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chicago Housing Authority by Cynthia Barnes Harris (Harris, Cynthia)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Harris, Cynthia)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Chicago Housing Authority; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19611202. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Harris, Cynthia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trimuel v. Chicago Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinzella Trimuel
Represented By: Jaclyn Zarack Koriath
Represented By: Daniel Quarfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney Chicago Housing Authority
Represented By: Sunil Kumar
Represented By: Cynthia Barnes Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Housing Authority
Represented By: Sunil Kumar
Represented By: Ryan Edward Smith
Represented By: Cynthia Barnes Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?