Havrilla et al v. Centene Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Havrilla, Cynthia Dawson, Alden Henriksen, Melody DeSchepper, Christopher Tilton and Mark Hackett
Defendant: Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company LLC and Celtic Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv04126
Filed: August 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Referring Judge: Nancy L Maldonado
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Filing 12 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 22-0018: Pursuant that to the Executive Committee Order entered on September 9, 2022, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 287 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado's webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such case; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado to the Court's criminal case assignment system ninety (90) days so that Judge Maldonado shall thereafter receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado for all further proceedings. Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/03/2022.(tg, )
September 28, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 10/7/2022, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 10/14/2022 at 8:55 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk)
September 1, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion of Amanda Steiner to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. (mk)
August 29, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19788709. (Steiner, Amanda)
August 27, 2022 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motions of Jennifer Rust Murray #6 and Beth E. Terrell #7 to appear pro hac vice are granted. (mk)
August 26, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19783636. (Terrell, Beth)
August 26, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19783614. (Murray, Jennifer)
August 11, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mark Hackett, Alden Henriksen, Cynthia Dawson, Melody DeSchepper, Matthew Havrilla, Christopher Tilton. All Defendants. (Wexler, Kenneth)
August 5, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cynthia Dawson, Melody DeSchepper, Mark Hackett, Matthew Havrilla, Alden Henriksen, Christopher Tilton by Zoran Tasic (Tasic, Zoran)
August 5, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cynthia Dawson, Melody DeSchepper, Mark Hackett, Matthew Havrilla, Alden Henriksen, Christopher Tilton by Justin Nicholas Boley (Boley, Justin)
August 5, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cynthia Dawson, Melody DeSchepper, Mark Hackett, Matthew Havrilla, Alden Henriksen, Christopher Tilton by Kenneth A. Wexler (Wexler, Kenneth)
August 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mark Hackett, Alden Henriksen, Cynthia Dawson, Melody DeSchepper, Matthew Havrilla, Christopher Tilton; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19718272. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wexler, Kenneth)
August 5, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jb, )
August 5, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jb, )
August 5, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Celtic Insurance Company, Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company LLC (mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Havrilla et al v. Centene Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Havrilla
Represented By: Justin Nicholas Boley
Represented By: Zoran Tasic
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Amanda Steiner
Represented By: Beth Ellen Terrell
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Dawson
Represented By: Justin Nicholas Boley
Represented By: Zoran Tasic
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Amanda Steiner
Represented By: Beth Ellen Terrell
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alden Henriksen
Represented By: Justin Nicholas Boley
Represented By: Zoran Tasic
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Amanda Steiner
Represented By: Beth Ellen Terrell
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody DeSchepper
Represented By: Justin Nicholas Boley
Represented By: Zoran Tasic
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Amanda Steiner
Represented By: Beth Ellen Terrell
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Tilton
Represented By: Justin Nicholas Boley
Represented By: Zoran Tasic
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Amanda Steiner
Represented By: Beth Ellen Terrell
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hackett
Represented By: Justin Nicholas Boley
Represented By: Zoran Tasic
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Amanda Steiner
Represented By: Beth Ellen Terrell
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Management Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celtic Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?