Manjee v. Lacey et al
Plaintiff: Shabbir Manjee
Defendant: Lewis Lacey, Village of Dolton, Sgt. Harris, Jeffrey DeVries and Unknown Dolton Police Officers
Case Number: 1:2022cv04640
Filed: August 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Referring Judge: Young B Kim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2022 Filing 18 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER:Case referred to the Honorable Young B. Kim for Discovery Supervision. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/27/22. (aee, )
October 27, 2022 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the motion #16 to consolidate, as well as the complaints and dockets in this case and Case No. 22-cv-04673, West and McCleenan v. Village of Dolton et al., the motion 16 to consolidate is denied without prejudice at this time. Although there is a general starting point commonality in that both sets of Plaintiffs allege constitutional violations arising out of the 09/01/2021 protest in the Village, there will otherwise too much divergence in facts to combine the cases. First, in this case, the Plaintiff has identified Officers Devries and Harris as participating in the violations, whereas the West Plaintiffs have yet to identify officers other than Commander Lacey. It is virtually assured that the Defendants in both cases (including the Doe Defendants, if and when they are identified) are going to defend the case based on allegations as to what the particular Plaintiffs did to justify being arrested and prosecuted. In other words, this is **not** a scenario in which one cohesive group of individual plaintiffs encountered one cohesive group of individual defendants and the claims thus overlap. Second, although Lacey is a common defendant in both cases, again that is not enough to say that Lacey acted in **common** toward the Plaintiffs across cases. Lastly, the parties are free to coordinate amongst themselves certain overlapping discovery, if there is any, such as records productions and deposition dates. So the motion #16 to consolidate is denied. On review of the status report, R. 14, the following discovery is set. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures due 11/15/2022. The first round of written discovery requests must be issued by 12/15/2022. Fact discovery, including any treating health care providers (if any), must be completed by 05/15/2023. Rule 26(a)(2)(C) summaries for treating health care providers (if any) must be disclosed 75 days in advance of the fact discovery deadline, and adjusts with any general extension of fact discovery deadline. Rule 16(b) deadline to add parties or amend pleadings is 02/15/2022.**No summary judgment motion may be filed before the close of fact discovery without prior authorization of the Court.** Discovery supervision is referred to the magistrate judge (including the authority to adjust all deadlines). The tracking status hearing of 10/28/2022 is reset to 01/13/2023 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Emailed notice (mw, )
October 24, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants Jeffrey DeVries, Village of Dolton, Sgt. Harris, Lewis Lacey to consolidate cases , MOTION by Defendants Jeffrey DeVries, Village of Dolton, Sgt. Harris, Lewis Lacey to reassign case UNOPPOSED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grandfield, Cynthia)
October 24, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Jeffrey DeVries, Village of Dolton, Sgt. Harris, Lewis Lacey(Grandfield, Cynthia)
October 24, 2022 Filing 14 STATUS Report JOINT by Jeffrey DeVries, Village of Dolton, Sgt. Harris, Lewis Lacey (Grandfield, Cynthia)
October 19, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Defendants' extension motion to file the joint initial status report #7 is granted to 10/24/2022. The tracking status hearing of 10/21/2022 is reset to 10/28/2022 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Emailed notice (mw, )
October 19, 2022 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT to extension of time #7 (Grandfield, Cynthia)
October 18, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Sgt. Harris. (Grandfield, Cynthia)
October 18, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jeffrey DeVries. (Grandfield, Cynthia)
October 18, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Lewis Lacey. (Grandfield, Cynthia)
October 18, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Village of Dolton. (Grandfield, Cynthia)
October 12, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendants Jeffrey DeVries, Village of Dolton, Sgt. Harris, Lewis Lacey for extension of time to file joint status report (Grandfield, Cynthia)
September 8, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jeffrey DeVries, Village of Dolton, Sgt. Harris, Lewis Lacey by Alisha Nicole Chambers (Chambers, Alisha)
September 8, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jeffrey DeVries, Village of Dolton, Sgt. Harris, Lewis Lacey by Cynthia Sara Grandfield (Grandfield, Cynthia)
September 7, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shabbir Manjee. All Defendants. (Power, Melinda)
September 2, 2022 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial tracking status hearing set for 10/21/2022 at 8:30 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will set the case schedule after reviewing the written status report. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 10/12/2022. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendants have not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If not all Defendants have been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel (or the parties, if proceeding pro se) must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel (or the party, if proceeding pro se) must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, )
August 31, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Shabbir Manjee by Melinda L. Power (Power, Melinda)
August 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Shabbir Manjee; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19794318. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Power, Melinda)
August 31, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (emc, )
August 31, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (emc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manjee v. Lacey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shabbir Manjee
Represented By: Melinda L. Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Lacey
Represented By: Cynthia Sara Grandfield
Represented By: Alisha Nicole Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Dolton
Represented By: Cynthia Sara Grandfield
Represented By: Alisha Nicole Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Harris
Represented By: Cynthia Sara Grandfield
Represented By: Alisha Nicole Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey DeVries
Represented By: Cynthia Sara Grandfield
Represented By: Alisha Nicole Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dolton Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?