Ramirez et al v. LexisNexis Risk Solutions
Plaintiff: Maria Fernanda Castel Ramirez, Rosa Carrasco, Claudia Marchan Torres, Mijente Support Committee and Organized Communities Against Deportations
Defendant: LexisNexis Risk Solutions
Case Number: 1:2022cv05384
Filed: September 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: The court has reviewed the joint status report. Initial disclosures to be exchanged by 12/13/22. The court will not stay written discovery while the motion to dismiss is pending but will stay oral discovery and ESI. Parties may serve written discovery after 1/30/23. By 3/21/23 parties should file a status report to indicate how discovery is proceeding. Mailed notice. (dm, )
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE by Rosa Carrasco, Mijente Support Committee, Organized Communities Against Deportations, Maria Fernanda Castel Ramirez, Claudia Marchan Torresin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions #12 (Daniel, Werner)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Rosa Carrasco, Mijente Support Committee, Organized Communities Against Deportations, Maria Fernanda Castel Ramirez, Claudia Marchan Torres (McCoy, Dinesh)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant's motion to exceed page limit #28 is granted. Defendant is granted leave to file a brief of up to 20 pages. Mailed notice. (dm, )
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION by Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions for leave to file excess pages (Kessler, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to exceed page limit #26 is granted. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file brief of up to 20 pages. Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiffs Rosa Carrasco, Mijente Support Committee, Organized Communities Against Deportations, Maria Fernanda Castel Ramirez, Claudia Marchan Torres for leave to file excess pages (Daniel, Werner)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Having established, at least for pleading purposes, that complete diversity of citizenship exists #24 , Defendant has complied with this Court's order #10 directing it to file a jurisdictional supplement. Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Defendant's Jurisdictional Statement by LexisNexis Risk Solutions (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Telephonic status hearing held. Counsel appeared telephonically. The court raised two potential conflict issues with the parties. Parties agreed the issues did not raise a concern requiring recusal. Briefing remains set #14 . Joint status report remains due #15 . Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Motion to appear pro hac vice by Dinesh McCoy #21 is granted. Counsel is reminded to become familiar with this court's local rules (including the rules requiring local counsel and describing this court's trial bar). Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19940042. (McCoy, Dinesh)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Motions to appear pro hac vice by Sejal R. Zota #17 and Daniel Werner #18 are granted. Counsel are reminded to become familiar with this court's local rules (including the rules requiring local counsel and describing this court's trial bar). Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Telephonic status set for 10/19/22 at 9:30 AM. Parties are to call 866-434-5269; access code 3751971. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19932215. (Daniel, Werner)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19930198. (zota, sejal)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rosa Carrasco, Mijente Support Committee, Organized Communities Against Deportations, Maria Fernanda Castel Ramirez, Claudia Marchan Torres by Daniel Joshua Schneider (Schneider, Daniel)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 11/14/22, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's motion to dismiss #12 is due 11/14/22. Defendant's reply due 11/29/22. The Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by LexisNexis Risk Solutions in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #12 (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Motions to appear pro hac vice by Jeffrey L. Kessler #6 , Jeffrey J. Amato #7 , and Michelle Tuma #8 are granted. Counsel are reminded to become familiar with this court's local rules (including the rules requiring local counsel and describing this court's trial bar). Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: In light of Defendant's invocation of diversity as the basis of federal jurisdiction #1 , on or before 10/24/22, Defendant shall file a jurisdictional supplement, as a separate docket entry. Defendant is reminded that for individuals, citizenship means domicile (the person's long-term plan for a state of habitation) rather than current residence. Dancel v. Groupon, Inc., 949 F.3d 999, 1003 (7th Cir. 2019). In addition, allegations "upon information and belief" are insufficient to establish diversity jurisdiction in the Seventh Circuit. See Qin v. Deslongchamps, 31 F.4th 576, 578 (7th Cir. 2022). Failure to file the jurisdictional supplement as directed may result in remand of this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (jn, )
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jb, )
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jn, )
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19900225. (Tuma, Michelle)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19900216. (Amato, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19900193. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by LexisNexis Risk Solutions (Wieber, Sean)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions by Thomas Francis Mcandrew (Mcandrew, Thomas)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions by Sean Gerald Wieber (Wieber, Sean)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wieber, Sean)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County Chancery Division, case number (2022CH07984) filed by LexisNexis Risk Solutions Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19900045. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wieber, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez et al v. LexisNexis Risk Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Fernanda Castel Ramirez
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Schneider
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Sejal R Zota
Represented By: Dinesh Keith McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Carrasco
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Schneider
Represented By: Daniel Warner
Represented By: Dinesh Keith McCoy
Represented By: Sejal R Zota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Marchan Torres
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Schneider
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Dinesh Keith McCoy
Represented By: Sejal R Zota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mijente Support Committee
Represented By: Sejal R Zota
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Schneider
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Dinesh Keith McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organized Communities Against Deportations
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Schneider
Represented By: Daniel Werner
Represented By: Dinesh Keith McCoy
Represented By: Sejal R Zota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LexisNexis Risk Solutions
Represented By: Sean Gerald Wieber
Represented By: Thomas Francis Mcandrew
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Amato
Represented By: Michelle Danielle Tuma
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?