Bader v. Thilman et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Bader, Camelback Manager LLC, Chicago 925 Investment Partners LLC, Rockwell Naperville Manager LLC, MC Manager, LLC, Tatum Manager, LLC and Stonegate II Manager LLC
Defendant: Edward Thilman, Douglas Fisher, Jason Fishleder, Matthew Welke and Rockwell Partners LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv05628
Filed: October 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 22 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Bader. Rockwell Partners LLC waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Spingola, Peter)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Bader. Matthew Welke waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Spingola, Peter)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Bader. Edward Thilman waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Spingola, Peter)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Bader. Tatum Manager, LLC waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Spingola, Peter)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Bader. Stonegate II Manager LLC waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Spingola, Peter)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Bader. Rockwell Naperville Manager LLC waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Spingola, Peter)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Bader. MC Manager, LLC waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Spingola, Peter)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Bader. Jason Fishleder waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Spingola, Peter)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Bader. Douglas Fisher waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Spingola, Peter)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Bader. Chicago 925 Investment Partners LLC waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Spingola, Peter)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Patrick Bader. Camelback Manager LLC waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Spingola, Peter)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FIRST VERIFIED AMENDED complaint by Patrick Bader against All Defendants and Camelback Manager, LLC; Chicago 925 Investment Partners, LLC; Rockwell Naperville Manager LLC; MC Manager LLC; Tatum Manager, LLC; and Stonegate II Manager LLC (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing of First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notifce of Filing)(Spingola, Peter)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 1/9/23, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrick Bader, Camelback Manager LLC, Chicago 925 Investment Partners LLC, MC Manager, LLC, Rockwell Naperville Manager LLC, Stonegate II Manager LLC, Tatum Manager, LLC by Alexander Gerald Karl (Karl, Alexander)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrick Bader, Camelback Manager LLC, Chicago 925 Investment Partners LLC, MC Manager, LLC, Rockwell Naperville Manager LLC, Stonegate II Manager LLC, Tatum Manager, LLC by Erica Katherine Achepohl (Achepohl, Erica)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrick Bader, Camelback Manager LLC, Chicago 925 Investment Partners LLC, MC Manager, LLC, Rockwell Naperville Manager LLC, Stonegate II Manager LLC, Tatum Manager, LLC by Kevin Michael Flynn Appearance of Kevin Michael Flynn (Flynn, Kevin)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrick Bader, Camelback Manager LLC, Chicago 925 Investment Partners LLC, MC Manager, LLC, Rockwell Naperville Manager LLC, Stonegate II Manager LLC, Tatum Manager, LLC by Robert J Shapiro (Shapiro, Robert)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrick Bader, Camelback Manager LLC, Chicago 925 Investment Partners LLC, MC Manager, LLC, Rockwell Naperville Manager LLC, Stonegate II Manager LLC, Tatum Manager, LLC by Peter Michael Spingola (Spingola, Peter)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (emc, )
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (emc, )
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrick Bader, Camelback Manager LLC, Chicago 925 Investment Partners LLC, MC Manager, LLC, Rockwell Naperville Manager LLC, Stonegate II Manager LLC, Tatum Manager, LLC by Kevin Michael Flynn Appearance of Erica A. Achepohl (Flynn, Kevin)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrick Bader, Camelback Manager LLC, Chicago 925 Investment Partners LLC, MC Manager, LLC, Rockwell Naperville Manager LLC, Stonegate II Manager LLC, Tatum Manager, LLC by Kevin Michael Flynn Appearance of Alexander G. Karl (Flynn, Kevin)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrick Bader, Camelback Manager LLC, Chicago 925 Investment Partners LLC, MC Manager, LLC, Rockwell Naperville Manager LLC, Stonegate II Manager LLC, Tatum Manager, LLC by Kevin Michael Flynn Appearance of Robert J. Shapiro (Flynn, Kevin)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrick Bader, Camelback Manager LLC, Chicago 925 Investment Partners LLC, MC Manager, LLC, Rockwell Naperville Manager LLC, Stonegate II Manager LLC, Tatum Manager, LLC by Kevin Michael Flynn Appearance of Peter M. Spingola (Flynn, Kevin)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Flynn, Kevin)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint filed by Patrick Bader; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19942858.(Flynn, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bader v. Thilman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Bader
Represented By: Kevin Michael Flynn
Represented By: Peter Michael Spingola
Represented By: Alexander Gerald Karl
Represented By: Erica Katherine Achepohl
Represented By: Robert J Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camelback Manager LLC
Represented By: Kevin Michael Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago 925 Investment Partners LLC
Represented By: Kevin Michael Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockwell Naperville Manager LLC
Represented By: Kevin Michael Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MC Manager, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Michael Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatum Manager, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Michael Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stonegate II Manager LLC
Represented By: Kevin Michael Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Thilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Fishleder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Welke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?