Pacmoore Products, Inc. v. Fifth Third Bank
Plaintiff: PACMOORE PRODUCTS, INC.
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Case Number: 1:2022cv05919
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice. (mma, )
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: The Court grants defendant's motion to dismiss [dkt. no. 19]. Because it is clear from the facts as set out in plaintiff's complaint that it cannot state a viable claim, the Court directs the Clerk to enter judgment dismissing the case with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/1/2023. Mailed notice. (mma, )
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This order corrects docket entry #28 which contained a typographical error. The telephonic status hearing set for this morning (4/20/2023) is vacated and reset to 5/4/2023 at 9:15 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Mailed notice. (mma, )
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The telephonic status hearing set for this morning (4/20/2023) is vacated and reset to 5/44/20/2023 at 9:15 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. (mk)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, the telephonic status hearing set for 3/23/2023 is vacated and reset to 4/20/2023 at 8:50 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. (mk)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 2/23/2023. Defendant's motion to dismiss #19 is taken under advisement. A telephonic status hearing is set for 3/23/2023 at 8:50 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (mma, )
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY by Fifth Third Bank to response in opposition to motion #22 Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Wright, Alexander)
February 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Unopposed motion for extension of time is granted. Due date for reply brief is extended to 2/23/2023. (mk)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION by Defendant Fifth Third Bank for extension of time to file response/reply as to response in opposition to motion #22 (Wright, Alexander)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE by Pacmoore Products, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Fifth Third Bank to dismiss the Amended Complaint #19 (Haan, Jack)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 1/10/2023. Plaintiff's response to the defendant's motion to dismiss #19 is due 1/30/2023; defendant's reply is due 2/21/2023. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures are due 3/3/2023. A telephonic status hearing is set for 2/23/2023 at 8:45 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (mma, )
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STATUS Report Joint Initial Report by Pacmoore Products, Inc. (Haan, Jack)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant Fifth Third Bank to dismiss the Amended Complaint (Wright, Alexander)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM of Law In Support of Fifth Third Bank, National Association's Memorandum of Law In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Wright, Alexander)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, the 12/13/2022 joint status report deadline and the 12/20/2022 telephonic status hearing are vacated. Mailed notice. (mma, )
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 12/13/2022, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 12/20/2022 at 8:50 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED complaint by Pacmoore Products, Inc. against Fifth Third Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Haan, Jack)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic motion hearing held on 11/29/2022. Plaintiff has until 12/2/2022 to file an amended complaint. A telephonic status hearing is set for 1/10/2023 at 8:50 a.m. By no later than 1/3/2023, the parties are directed to file a joint status report stating a discovery and pretrial schedule along with any updates on settlement. Defendant's response to the amended complaint is due 12/30/2022. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (mma, )
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Fifth Third Bank National Association's Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interest (Wright, Alexander)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This case is set for a telephonic status/motion hearing on 11/29/2022 at 9:10 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff should be prepared to advise the Court on that date whether it wishes to amend its complaint to attempt to address the motion to dismiss filed by defendant or whether it instead wishes to respond to the motion to dismiss. The Court will set an appropriate schedule at that time. (mk)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interest by Defendant Fifth Third Bank for disclosure of (Wright, Alexander) Modified on 11/18/2022 (gcy, ).
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Fifth Third Bank in support of motion to dismiss #8 Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) (Wright, Alexander)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Fifth Third Bank to dismiss The Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 12(B)(6) (Wright, Alexander)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Unopposed motion to set deadline #6 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 11/17/2022. (mk)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant Fifth Third Bank for extension of time to file answer UNOPPOSED (Wright, Alexander)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pacmoore Products, Inc. by Jack Leonard Haan (Haan, Jack)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (ph, )
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ph, )
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fifth Third Bank by Alexander Nicholas Wright (Wright, Alexander)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wright, Alexander)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2022L008817) filed by Fifth Third Bank Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19985347. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Wright, Alexander)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacmoore Products, Inc. v. Fifth Third Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACMOORE PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Jack Leonard Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Alexander Nicholas Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?