Mohammed v. Pallmeyer et al
Plaintiff: Abdul Mohammed
Defendant: Chief Judge Rebecca Pallmeyer, Chief Judge Diane Sykes, Clerk Thomas Bruton, Judge Jorge Alonso, Judge John Blakey, Judge Thomas Durkin, Judge Gary Feinerman, Judge Robert Gettleman, Judge Iain Johnston, Judge William Bauer, Judge Joel Flaum, Judge Frank Easterbrook, Judge Kenneth Ripple, Judge Daniel Manion, Judge Michael Kanne, Judge Ilana Rovner, Judge Diane Wood, Judge David Hamilton, Judge Michael Brennan, Judge Michael Scudder, Judge Amy St. Eve, Judge Thomas Kirsch, II, Judge Candace Jackson-Akiwumi, Judge Marvin Aspen, Judge Elaine E Bucklo, Judge Edmond E. Chang, Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman, Judge Robert M. Dow, Jr., Judge Sara Ellis, Judge Joan Gottschall, Judge Virginia Kendall, Judge Matthew F. Kennelly, Judge John Kness, Judge Charles Kocoras, Judge John Lee, Judge Joan H Lefkow, Judge Harry D Leinenweber, Judge Charles Norgle, Judge Martha M. Pacold, Judge Phillip G Reinhard, Judge Mary M Rowland, Judge Steven Seeger, Judge Manish Shah, Judge John J. Tharp, Jr., Judge Andrea Wood, United States of America, Thomas Bruton, Judge Michael Scudder, Jr., Judge Ronald Guzman and Members of the Executive Committee of the United District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Case Number: 1:2022cv05937
Filed: October 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN of U.S. Post Office receipt, article no. 7021 1970 0001 3330 0281. (jh, )
November 8, 2022 MAILED EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER #7 , certified, dated 11/07/2022 to Abdul Mohammed via email. (rc, )
November 8, 2022 MAILED EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER #7 , certified, dated 11/07/2022 to Abdul Mohammed via certified mail #7021 1970 0001 3330 0281. (rc, )
November 7, 2022 Filing 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: On June 17, 2020, an Executive Committee order was entered directing that any new complaints filed by Abdul Mohammed and transferred to this Court from another jurisdiction shall be reviewed by the Executive Committee to determine whether they should be filed. The June 17, 2020 order noted that since February 22, 2016, pro se litigant Abdul Mohammed had filed at least 14 cases in the Northern District of Illinois. The cases were terminated for reasons such as defendants' motion for summary judgment, case stayed pending arbitration, plaintiff's motion to voluntarily dismiss, failure to state a claim, lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and frivolous complaint. On January 11, 2021, the United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit sanctioned Mr. Mohammed (No. 20-3178, Abdul Mohammed v. National Labor Relations Board). The sanction order stated, "Abdul Azeem Mohammed has forfeited the privilege of proceeding in any new or pending case in the district court or court of appeals, until he has paid, in full, all outstanding fees and costs for all of his lawsuits." The sanction order continued, "In any application to proceed in forma pauperis or motion to lift this restriction, Mohammed must provide (under oath) a complete list of all of his federal suits and proof that all of his financial obligations with respect to these suits have been met." On November 8, 2021, the Executive Committee issued an order that again stated any new complaints filed by Mr. Mohammed and transferred to this Court from another jurisdiction shall be reviewed by the Executive Committee to determine whether they should be filed. The order also cautioned Mr. Mohammed that any future submission must comply with the January 11, 2021 sanction order from the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals, and that, absent compliance, the Executive Committee will not consider the submission. Finally, the Executive Committee order warned that Mr. Mohammed would face possible additional sanctions, including contempt, monetary penalties, or further filing restrictions if he failed to follow the directives of the sanction order when he filed those documents. Since the January 11, 2021 order entered by the United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, the Executive Committee has reviewed at least seven cases Abdul Mohammed filed in the Circuit Court Cook County and that have been removed to this Court. Several of these cases have been dismissed for failure to state a claim, or because they are duplicative. During the November 2022 Executive Committee meeting, members reviewed recently removed cases that were originally filed in the Circuit Court of Cook County and Kane County. See: 22-cv-04679 Mohammed v. Comcast OTR1 LLC et al, 22-cv-05786 Mohammed v. Pallmeyer et al, 22-cv-05937 Mohammed v. Pallmeyer et al, These cases were reviewed pursuant to the previously entered orders by this Court. The Executive Committee finds that Mr. Mohammed has a pattern of filing cases in the Circuit Courts of Illinois only to be removed to this Court as a way of bypassing the current filing restrictions. Two of the filings being currently reviewed are duplicative of each other (see 22-cv-05786, Mohammed v. Pallmeyer et al, and 22-cv-05937, Mohammed v. Pallmeyer, et al), but were filed in two different Circuit Courts. After reviewing the current filings, the Executive Committee HEREBY ORDERS THAT: 1. Mohammed is denied leave to file the following cases in the Northern District of Illinois, and these cases are hereby dismissed with prejudice: 22-cv-04679, Mohammed v. Comcast OTR1 LLC, et al, 22-cv-05786, Mohammed v. Pallmeyer et al, and 22-cv-05937, Mohammed v. Pallmeyer, et al. 2. Mr. Mohammed has established a pattern of filing duplicative and frivolous cases even after being enjoined from filing new cases in this District and being sanctioned by the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals. Mr. Mohammed has been warned several times that additional sanctions will be imposed. Therefore, until the filing restrictions from this Court and the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals have been lifted, any case removed to or transferred to this Court will be dismissed, unless he demonstrates to the Executive Committee in writing that he is in imminent danger of great bodily harm. 3. No sooner than 12 months from the date of this order, Mr. Mohammed may submit to the Executive Committee a motion to modify or rescind the restrictions against him. 4. This Order does not affect Mr. Mohammed's (a) ability to defend himself in any criminal action, (b) access to the federal courts through the filing of a petition for a writ of habeas corpus or other extraordinary writ, or (c) access to the United States Court of Appeals or the United States Supreme Court. 5. The Clerk of Court shall cause a copy of this order to be mailed by certified or registered mail, return receipt requested, to Mr. Mohammed at 258 East Bailey Rd., Apt C, Naperville, IL, 60565 and emailed to: aamohammed@hotmail.com. 6. The Clerk of Court shall cause a copy of this order to be docketed on 20cv 3479, In Re: Abdul Mohammed, 22-cv-04679, Mohammed v. Comcast OTR1 LLC, et al, 22-cv-05786, Mohammed v. Pallmeyer et al, and 22-cv-05937, Mohammed v. Pallmeyer, et al. 7. The Clerk of Court shall close and dismissed with prejudice 22-cv-04679, Mohammed v. Comcast OTR1 LLC, et al, 22-cv-05786, Mohammed v. Pallmeyer et al, and 22-cv-05937, Mohammed v. Pallmeyer, et al, and terminate all pending motions. 8. This Order is final and appealable. Signed by the Executive Committee on 11/7/2022. Mailed notice. (lw, )
October 31, 2022 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (jmk, )
October 27, 2022 Filing 5 MAILED Rule 77d Letter to counsel of record. (gcy, )
October 27, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION by Defendant United States of America to Refer This Case to the Executive Committee for Screening and to Dismiss (Walsh, Thomas)
October 27, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Walsh, Thomas)
October 27, 2022 Filing 2 DESIGNATION of Thomas P. Walsh as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United States of America (Walsh, Thomas)
October 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2022-L-008181) filed by Jorge Alonso, Marvin Aspen, William Bauer, John Blakey, Michael Brennan, Thomas Bruton, Elaine E Bucklo, Edmond E. Chang, Sharon Johnson Coleman, Robert M. Dow, Jr., Thomas Durkin, Frank Easterbrook, Sara Ellis, Gary Feinerman, Joel Flaum, Robert Gettleman, Joan Gottschall, David Hamilton, Candace Jackson-Akiwumi, Iain Johnston, Michael Kanne, Virginia Kendall, Matthew F. Kennelly, Thomas Kirsch, II, John Kness, Charles Kocoras, John Lee, Joan H Lefkow, Harry D Leinenweber, Daniel Manion, Charles Norgle, Martha M. Pacold, Rebecca Pallmeyer, Phillip G Reinhard, Kenneth Ripple, Ilana Rovner, Mary M Rowland, Michael Scudder, Steven Seeger, Manish Shah, Amy St. Eve, Diane Sykes, John J. Tharp, Jr, United States of America, Andrea Wood, Diane Wood (Walsh, Thomas)
October 27, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jb, )
October 27, 2022 MAILED Clerk's Notice Rule 73.1 with Joint Consent Form to Abdul Mohammed. (gcy, )
October 27, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohammed v. Pallmeyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdul Mohammed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Judge Rebecca Pallmeyer
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Judge Diane Sykes
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk Thomas Bruton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Jorge Alonso
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge John Blakey
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Thomas Durkin
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Gary Feinerman
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Robert Gettleman
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Iain Johnston
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge William Bauer
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Joel Flaum
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Frank Easterbrook
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Kenneth Ripple
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Daniel Manion
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Michael Kanne
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Ilana Rovner
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Diane Wood
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge David Hamilton
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Michael Brennan
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Michael Scudder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Amy St. Eve
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Thomas Kirsch, II
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Candace Jackson-Akiwumi
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Marvin Aspen
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Elaine E Bucklo
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Edmond E. Chang
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Robert M. Dow, Jr.
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Sara Ellis
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Joan Gottschall
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Virginia Kendall
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Matthew F. Kennelly
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge John Kness
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Charles Kocoras
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge John Lee
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Joan H Lefkow
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Harry D Leinenweber
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Charles Norgle
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Martha M. Pacold
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Phillip G Reinhard
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Mary M Rowland
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Steven Seeger
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Manish Shah
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge John J. Tharp, Jr.
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Andrea Wood
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas P. Walsh
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Bruton
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Michael Scudder, Jr.
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Ronald Guzman
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Members of the Executive Committee of the United District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?