Galloway et al v. CHS Acquisition Corp., et al
Plaintiff: Amy C. Galloway, Laurie A. Corral, Stephen G. Galloway and Brian MacEachern
Defendant: CHS Acquisition Corp. d/b/a Chicago Heights Steel, Highway Steel, Inc., RMI, Inc., Bradley R. Corral and CHS Acquisition Corp. doing business as Chicago Heights Steel
Case Number: 1:2022cv06059
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: A notice of voluntary dismissal has been filed. This case is dismissed without prejudice. Defendants' motion to dismiss #21 is denied as moot. Civil case terminated. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
December 19, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Laurie A. Corral, Amy C. Galloway, Stephen G. Galloway, Brian MacEachern (Swibel, Eric)
December 12, 2022 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' complaint #21 is taken under advisement. Plaintiffs' response shall be filed by 1/9/23; Defendants' reply shall be filed by 1/23/23. Motion hearing date of 12/13/22 is stricken. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
December 1, 2022 Filing 23 Defendants' NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Samuel Goodman for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #21 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/13/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Goodman, Jonathan)
December 1, 2022 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by CHS Acquisition Corp., Bradley R. Corral, Highway Steel, Inc., RMI, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #21 Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (Goodman, Jonathan)
December 1, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Highway Steel, Inc., RMI, Inc., Bradley R. Corral, CHS Acquisition Corp. , MOTION by Defendants Highway Steel, Inc., RMI, Inc., Bradley R. Corral, CHS Acquisition Corp. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Defendants' Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (Goodman, Jonathan)
November 30, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian MacEachern, Amy C. Galloway, Stephen G. Galloway, Laurie A. Corral as to Bradley R. Corral on 11/10/2022, answer due 12/1/2022. (Swibel, Eric)
November 30, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian MacEachern, Amy C. Galloway, Stephen G. Galloway, Laurie A. Corral as to RMI, Inc. on 11/10/2022, answer due 12/1/2022. (Swibel, Eric)
November 30, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian MacEachern, Amy C. Galloway, Stephen G. Galloway, Laurie A. Corral as to Highway Steel, Inc. on 11/10/2022, answer due 12/1/2022. (Swibel, Eric)
November 30, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian MacEachern, Amy C. Galloway, Stephen G. Galloway, Laurie A. Corral as to CHS Acquisition Corp. on 11/10/2022, answer due 12/1/2022. (Swibel, Eric)
November 30, 2022 Filing 16 COMPLAINT (Redacted Version) filed by Brian MacEachern, Amy C. Galloway, Stephen G. Galloway, Laurie A. Corral; (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Swibel, Eric)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Defendants' motion to seal #12 is granted. Plaintiffs are directed to file a public redacted version of the complaint and its attached exhibits as a separate docket entry. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/30/2022. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
November 23, 2022 Filing 14 Plaintiffs' Brief Regarding Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Complaint and Exhibits Under Seal by Laurie A. Corral, Amy C. Galloway, Stephen G. Galloway, Brian MacEachern (Swibel, Eric)
November 23, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Motion for Motion for Leave to File Under Seal NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Samuel Goodman for presentment of motion for leave to file #12 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/7/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Goodman, Jonathan)
November 23, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants CHS Acquisition Corp., Bradley R. Corral, Highway Steel, Inc., RMI, Inc. for leave to file Under Seal (Goodman, Jonathan)
November 23, 2022 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by CHS Acquisition Corp., Highway Steel, Inc., RMI, Inc. and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Goodman, Jonathan)
November 23, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants CHS Acquisition Corp., Bradley R. Corral, Highway Steel, Inc., RMI, Inc. by Elizabeth Loretta Archerd (Archerd, Elizabeth)
November 23, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants CHS Acquisition Corp., Bradley R. Corral, Highway Steel, Inc., RMI, Inc. by Jonathan Samuel Goodman (Goodman, Jonathan)
November 23, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Laurie A. Corral, Amy C. Galloway, Stephen G. Galloway, Brian MacEachern by Amelia Gunderson Raether (Raether, Amelia)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion #4 for leave to file their complaint and exhibits under seal is denied. Defendants may file a renewed motion to seal along with supporting materials, including proposed redacted public versions of the complaint and exhibits, by 11/23/22. By the same date, plaintiffs may file a brief setting forth their position, if any, on whether the documents should be maintained under seal. The complaint and exhibits will remain provisionally under seal in the interim. The parties are warned that if they do not demonstrate good cause for maintaining the documents under seal by the above deadline, the Court will unseal the documents. Motion hearing date of 11/10/22 is stricken. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/9/2022. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
November 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Eric Robert Swibel for presentment of motion for leave to file #4 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/10/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Swibel, Eric)
November 7, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants CHS Acquisition Corp., Bradley R. Corral, Highway Steel, Inc., RMI, Inc. (smb, )
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20017840. (Swibel, Eric)
November 4, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, )
November 4, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, )
November 2, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiffs Laurie A. Corral, Amy C. Galloway, Stephen G. Galloway, Brian MacEachern for leave to file under seal (Swibel, Eric)
November 2, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Laurie A. Corral, Amy C. Galloway, Stephen G. Galloway, Brian MacEachern by Eric Robert Swibel (Swibel, Eric)
November 2, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Swibel, Eric)
November 2, 2022 Filing 1 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Laurie A. Corral, Amy C. Galloway, Stephen G. Galloway, Brian MacEachern - Sealed Complaint (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Swibel, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galloway et al v. CHS Acquisition Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy C. Galloway
Represented By: Eric Robert Swibel
Represented By: Amelia Gunderson Raether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie A. Corral
Represented By: Eric Robert Swibel
Represented By: Amelia Gunderson Raether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen G. Galloway
Represented By: Eric Robert Swibel
Represented By: Amelia Gunderson Raether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian MacEachern
Represented By: Eric Robert Swibel
Represented By: Amelia Gunderson Raether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Acquisition Corp. d/b/a Chicago Heights Steel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highway Steel, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Goodman
Represented By: Elizabeth Loretta Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMI, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Goodman
Represented By: Elizabeth Loretta Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley R. Corral
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Goodman
Represented By: Elizabeth Loretta Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Acquisition Corp. doing business as Chicago Heights Steel
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Goodman
Represented By: Elizabeth Loretta Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?