Van Dyke v. JP Morgan Chase et al
Plaintiff: Christel Van Dyke
Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. d/b/a Chase Bank, a national banking association, Chase Home Finance L.L.C., Cyprexx Services, LLC, Village realty, Jana Foreman, MTGLQ Investors, L.P. and JP Morgan Chase
Case Number: 1:2022cv06063
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff is directed to file a Status Report on 1/3/2023, if an amended complaint is not filed prior to that date. Mailed notice (cn).
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Telephonic hearing held on 11/8/2022. Plaintiff's counsel appeared and notified the court that he will be filing an amended complaint after which he will serve the defendant. Mailed notice (cn).
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christel Van Dyke by Jason R. Craddock, Sr (Craddock, Jason)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Craddock, Jason)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The complaint in this case alleges that it is the refiling of a previous case, but fails to identify that case by number or otherwise. In addition, plaintiff's counsel has failed to complete and file a cover sheet as required by the local rules of this court. The court staff has emailed and called plaintiff's attorney on a number of occasions, and has not had the courtesy of a return communication. Plaintiff's attorney is directed to participate in a status call via WebEx on 11/8/2022 at 9:45 a.m. Failure to appear on that call will result in dismissal of this case. Parties will not be asked to start their video. Members of the public and media may listen to these proceedings by dialing (650) 4793207 the meeting number, access code, or PIN/ID is 1809883385. Counsel of record and other essential case participants will receive an email prior to the start of the hearing with instructions to join the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (cn).
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: #Local Rule 3.3# requires that any document submitted for filing for which a filing fee is required must be accompanied either by the appropriate fee or an In Forma Pauperis Application and Financial Affidavit. No filing fee or IFP petition was submitted at the time of filing this matter. Christel Van Dyke is directed to pay the required filing fee or submit a completed #In Forma Pauperis Application and Financial Affidavit# within 15 days of this notification. Pursuant to LR 3.3(f), failure to comply with this order may result in sanctions, including dismissal of the action by the assigned judge. Signed by the Executive Committee. (lm, )
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: #Local Rule 3.1# requires at the time of filing a case, plaintiff's counsel, or if the case is filed pro se, the plaintiff shall file with the original papers a completed designation sheet (civil cover sheet). No civil cover sheet was submitted at the time of filing this matter. Christel Van Dyke is directed to file the #Civil Cover Sheet# within 14 days of this notification. Signed by the Executive Committee. (lm, )
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lm, )
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lm, )
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Christel Van Dyke; jury demand. (Craddock, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Dyke v. JP Morgan Chase et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christel Van Dyke
Represented By: Jason R. Craddock, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. d/b/a Chase Bank, a national banking association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprexx Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTGLQ Investors, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?