Deckers Outdoor Corporation v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Plaintiff: Deckers Outdoor Corporation
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A, Fuzhou Zhongqian Import And Export Trading Co., Ltd., Gucheng County Laiman Fur Products Co., Ltd., Azure Cartier Store, BKQU Store, BOBOANER Store, Business To Worldwide Store, charlie2new Store, Designer Shoe 4 Store, DOGHC QIANZHU Store, Dropshipping Mr Li Store, edithrpfd_ioffer Store, fashionable casual shoe store Store, F-Fiona Bag Store, GRACEFULLEAVES Mu ChenZe Fur Store, Jastie Luxury Store, junjunyi Store, KEKURILY Official Store, Kroe Boutique Store, lady love it Store, LuckyYoung Store, MeMiki Store, Mssugar1112 Store, My foothold Store, Noble Princess Wardrobe Store, Shop1100234038 Store, Shop1100239003 Store, Shop1100291172 Store, Shop1100292049 Store, Shop1102141153 Store, Shop1102185358 Store, Shop1102192051 Store, Shop1102196841 Store, Shop4194009 Store, Shop5217030 Store, Shop900237062 Store, Shop910363383 Store, Shop912625157 Store, Unique Female Store, WIGQCY Store, WYVVLNT Official Store, XLLCWC CNFUEDEOFF Fashion Shoes Store, YANGMOTO Store, Yongxin shoe store Store, ZHENQI Store, A14ERM4H0R7O32, A27LJN1G8KLW2U666, A3K4860T5ADY0S666, baoyong--US, Big mai, Cosmic Passepartout, CT-Tebrun, FangJingBaiHuoShangHang, FEIFEISTORE, guanduquxiangzouyinriyongbaihuojingyingbu, guangzhoushiyongyaowangluokejiyouxiangongsi, HongHaoDi, huanchun666, HYHZBM, Litte Leaves, MANZHONGMAOYI, PinZhiQiMao, Qiong Huang Bai Huo, runcaishanghang, TengLianDianZiShangWu, uyrnsdhe, Vonair Comfortable Shoes Supplier, WEIXIAOTSD, xingxing520, xuxiangyangdedian, zhoujianchundedianpu, niunian Store and HEVIRGO
Case Number: 1:2022cv06075
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2022 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone hearing as to the motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #38 is set for 1/3/2023 at 9:00 a.m. The dial in information will remain the same. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 29, 2022 Filing 42 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 28, 2022 Filing 41 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant HEVIRGO by Adam Edward Urbanczyk (Urbanczyk, Adam)
December 28, 2022 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #39 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
December 28, 2022 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM by Deckers Outdoor Corporation in support of motion for entry of default,, motion for default judgment, #38 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Martin, Allyson)
December 28, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for default judgment as to all Defendants with the exception of a certain Defendant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martin, Allyson)
December 28, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Deckers Outdoor Corporation as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson)
December 22, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Deckers Outdoor Corporation as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson)
December 15, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Deckers Outdoor Corporation as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson)
December 2, 2022 Filing 34 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/2/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 2, 2022 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held by telephone on 12/2/2022. No one appeared on behalf of defendants. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction #28 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The Clerk's office is directed to unseal Schedule A to the Complaint #2 , Exhibit 1 to the Complaint #3 , Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Lisa Bereda #18 and the TRO #23 . Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. A telephone status hearing is set for 1/3/2023 at 9:00 a.m., unless a hearing on a motion for default is scheduled before that time. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 2, 2022 NEW PARTIES: Fuzhou Zhongqian Import And Export Trading Co., Ltd., Gucheng County Laiman Fur Products Co., Ltd., Azure Cartier Store, BKQU Store, BOBOANER Store, Business To Worldwide Store, charlie2new Store, Designer Shoe 4 Store, DOGHC QIANZHU Store, Dropshipping Mr Li Store, edithrpfd_ioffer Store, fashionable casual shoe store Store, F-Fiona Bag Store, GRACEFULLEAVES Mu ChenZe Fur Store, Jastie Luxury Store, junjunyi Store, KEKURILY Official Store, Kroe Boutique Store, lady love it Store, LuckyYoung Store, MeMiki Store, Mssugar1112 Store, My foothold Store, Noble Princess Wardrobe Store, Shop1100234038 Store, Shop1100239003 Store, Shop1100291172 Store, Shop1100292049 Store, Shop1102141153 Store, Shop1102185358 Store, Shop1102192051 Store, Shop1102196841 Store, Shop4194009 Store, Shop5217030 Store, Shop900237062 Store, Shop910363383 Store, Shop912625157 Store, Unique Female Store, WIGQCY Store, WYVVLNT Official Store, XLLCWC CNFUEDEOFF Fashion Shoes Store, YANGMOTO Store, Yongxin shoe store Store, ZHENQI Store, A14ERM4H0R7O32, A27LJN1G8KLW2U666, A3K4860T5ADY0S666, baoyong--US, Big mai, Cosmic Passepartout, CT-Tebrun, FangJingBaiHuoShangHang, FEIFEISTORE, guanduquxiangzouyinriyongbaihuojingyingbu, guangzhoushiyongyaowangluokejiyouxiangongsi, HongHaoDi, huanchun666, HYHZBM, Litte Leaves, MANZHONGMAOYI, PinZhiQiMao, Qiong Huang Bai Huo, runcaishanghang, TengLianDianZiShangWu, uyrnsdhe, Vonair Comfortable Shoes Supplier, WEIXIAOTSD, xingxing520, xuxiangyangdedian, zhoujianchundedianpu, niunian Store and HEVIRGO added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy)
December 1, 2022 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by Marcella Deshonda Slay (Slay, Marcella)
November 30, 2022 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone hearing as to the motion for preliminary injunction #28 is set for 12/2/2022 at 9:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 30, 2022 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deckers Outdoor Corporation as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A on 11/30/2022, answer due 12/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas J. Juettner, #2 Exhibit A)(Juettner, Thomas)
November 30, 2022 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by Deckers Outdoor Corporation in support of motion for preliminary injunction #28 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allyson M. Martin, #2 Exhibit 1)(Martin, Allyson)
November 30, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martin, Allyson)
November 16, 2022 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #25 is granted. The Temporary Restraining Order entered on 11/7/2022 #23 is extended by a period of fourteen (14) days until 12/5/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 16, 2022 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by Deckers Outdoor Corporation in support of extension of time #25 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allyson M. Martin)(Martin, Allyson)
November 16, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Martin, Allyson)
November 10, 2022 Filing 24 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Document not imaged) (nsf, )
November 7, 2022 Filing 23 SEALED Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/7/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 7, 2022 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery #14 is granted. Enter order. Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) #19 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 7, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A (smb, )
November 4, 2022 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 4, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by Deckers Outdoor Corporation in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #19 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 4, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporationfor Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
November 4, 2022 Filing 18 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation Exhibit 2 - Parts 1 - 3 regarding declaration #17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-1, #2 Exhibit 2-2, #3 Exhibit 2-3)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 4, 2022 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Lisa Bereda regarding memorandum in support of motion #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 4, 2022 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 4, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Deckers Outdoor Corporation in support of motion for temporary restraining order #14 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 4, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
November 4, 2022 Filing 13 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jmk, )
November 3, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for leave to file under seal #4 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
November 3, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by Thomas Joseph Juettner (Juettner, Thomas)
November 3, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
November 3, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
November 3, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
November 3, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Claims Involving Patents by Deckers Outdoor Corporation (Gaudio, Justin)
November 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Deckers Outdoor Corporation (Gaudio, Justin)
November 3, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
November 3, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
November 3, 2022 Filing 3 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation Exhibit 1 - Parts 1-3 regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit 1-3)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Deckers Outdoor Corporation; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20009762. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 3, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, )
November 3, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deckers Outdoor Corporation v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deckers Outdoor Corporation
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Juettner
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Marcella Deshonda Slay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuzhou Zhongqian Import And Export Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gucheng County Laiman Fur Products Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azure Cartier Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BKQU Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOBOANER Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business To Worldwide Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: charlie2new Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Designer Shoe 4 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOGHC QIANZHU Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dropshipping Mr Li Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: edithrpfd_ioffer Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fashionable casual shoe store Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F-Fiona Bag Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRACEFULLEAVES Mu ChenZe Fur Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jastie Luxury Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: junjunyi Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEKURILY Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroe Boutique Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lady love it Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LuckyYoung Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MeMiki Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mssugar1112 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My foothold Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Princess Wardrobe Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1100234038 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1100239003 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1100291172 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1100292049 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1102141153 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1102185358 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1102192051 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1102196841 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop4194009 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop5217030 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop900237062 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop910363383 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop912625157 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unique Female Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIGQCY Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYVVLNT Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XLLCWC CNFUEDEOFF Fashion Shoes Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YANGMOTO Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yongxin shoe store Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZHENQI Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A14ERM4H0R7O32
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A27LJN1G8KLW2U666
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A3K4860T5ADY0S666
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: baoyong--US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big mai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosmic Passepartout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CT-Tebrun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FangJingBaiHuoShangHang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEIFEISTORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: guanduquxiangzouyinriyongbaihuojingyingbu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: guangzhoushiyongyaowangluokejiyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HongHaoDi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: huanchun666
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYHZBM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litte Leaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANZHONGMAOYI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PinZhiQiMao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qiong Huang Bai Huo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: runcaishanghang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TengLianDianZiShangWu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: uyrnsdhe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vonair Comfortable Shoes Supplier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIXIAOTSD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xingxing520
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xuxiangyangdedian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhoujianchundedianpu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: niunian Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEVIRGO
Represented By: Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?