Sport Dimension, Inc. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: Sport Dimension, Inc.
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto, Silfrae, YKXSK, Joulli Store, dongguanshisuyingshangmaoyouxiangongsi, Mora Tech, huaxuan, Shenzhen Weitian Industrial Co., Ltd., Fuyu, shenzhenshi shenghuashuo dianzishangwu youxiangongsi, Shenzhen Rongxiner Network Technology Co., Ltd., Qingtian Diaocheng Trading Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Dali Industry Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Linglangxi Network Technology Co., Ltd., tengjingyue, yalita, Caitzr, chengdulijingyaxiumaoyiyouxiangongsi, haoshengqiyue, Qingtian Yingying Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd., shenzhenshiyishengyangdianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, sigeshangmao, tianjinshidongfangsugouwangluokejiyouxiangongsi and xuhua
Case Number: 1:2022cv06945
Filed: December 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2023 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendant YKXSK's motion for extension of time #40 is granted. Defendant YKXSK shall answer or otherwise plead by 4/3/23. Defendants Caitzr, Fuyu, Joulli Store, Mora Tech, Qingtian Diaocheng Trading Co., Ltd., Qingtian Yingying Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Dali Industry Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Linglangxi Network Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Rongxiner Network Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Weitian Industrial Co., Ltd., chengdulijingyaxiumaoyiyouxiangongsi, dongguanshisuyingshangmaoyouxiangongsi, haoshengqiyue, huaxuan, shenzhenshi shenghuashuo dianzishangwu youxiangongsi, shenzhenshiyishengyangdianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, sigeshangmao, tengjingyue, tianjinshidongfangsugouwangluokejiyouxiangongsi, xuhua, and yalita's unopposed motion for extension of time #42 is granted and they shall answer or otherwise plead by 2/21/23. Mailed notice (vcf, )
February 9, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sport Dimension, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 43, 45 (Hierl, Michael)
February 6, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sport Dimension, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 23 (Hierl, Michael)
February 6, 2023 Filing 42 MOTION by Defendants Caitzr, Fuyu, Joulli Store, Mora Tech, Qingtian Diaocheng Trading Co., Ltd., Qingtian Yingying Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Dali Industry Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Linglangxi Network Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Rongxiner Network Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Weitian Industrial Co., Ltd., chengdulijingyaxiumaoyiyouxiangongsi, dongguanshisuyingshangmaoyouxiangongsi, haoshengqiyue, huaxuan, shenzhenshi shenghuashuo dianzishangwu youxiangongsi, shenzhenshiyishengyangdianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, sigeshangmao, tengjingyue, tianjinshidongfangsugouwangluokejiyouxiangongsi, xuhua, yalita for extension of time (Unopposed) (Pittaway, Lydia)
February 6, 2023 Filing 41 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Joulli Store, dongguanshisuyingshangmaoyouxiangongsi, Mora Tech, huaxuan, Shenzhen Weitian Industrial Co., Ltd., Fuyu, shenzhenshi shenghuashuo dianzishangwu youxiangongsi, Shenzhen Rongxiner Network Technology Co., Ltd., Qingtian Diaocheng Trading Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Dali Industry Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Linglangxi Network Technology Co., Ltd., tengjingyue, yalita, Caitzr, chengdulijingyaxiumaoyiyouxiangongsi, haoshengqiyue, Qingtian Yingying Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd., shenzhenshiyishengyangdianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, sigeshangmao, tianjinshidongfangsugouwangluokejiyouxiangongsi, xuhua by Lydia Pittaway (Pittaway, Lydia)
January 31, 2023 Filing 40 MOTION by Defendant YKXSK for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Motion to Set Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Konieczny, Daniel)
January 30, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sport Dimension, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 34 (Hierl, Michael)
January 30, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sport Dimension, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 104 (Hierl, Michael)
January 27, 2023 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant YKXSK by Daniel I. Konieczny (Konieczny, Daniel)
January 25, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sport Dimension, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 32, 41, 54, 89 (Hierl, Michael)
January 18, 2023 Filing 35 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER AGAINST DEFENDANT Nos. 1-6, 16-31 and 58-126. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/18/2023. Mailed notice(vcf, )
January 12, 2023 Filing 34 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Sport Dimension, Inc. (Document not scanned). (jg, )
January 11, 2023 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Ex Parte Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order as to Defendant nos. 7-15 and 32-57 #27 is granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry a Preliminary Injunction against Defendant nos. 1-6, 16-31 and 58-126 #28 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
January 11, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sport Dimension, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 94 (Hierl, Michael)
January 10, 2023 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sport Dimension, Inc. as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. (Hierl, Michael)
January 9, 2023 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #28 (Hierl, Michael)
January 9, 2023 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by Sport Dimension, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #28 (Hierl, Michael)
January 9, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiff Sport Dimension, Inc. for preliminary injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Nos. 1-6, 16-31 and 58-126 (Hierl, Michael)
January 9, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION by Plaintiff Sport Dimension, Inc. for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order as to Defendant Nos. 7-15 and 32-57 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael)
January 9, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto (smb, )
January 6, 2023 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant YKXSK by Hua Chen (Chen, Hua)
December 31, 2022 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Silfrae by Jiyuan Zhang (Zhang, Jiyuan)
December 29, 2022 Filing 24 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 22, 2022 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's ex-parte motion to extend the Temporary Restraining Order to and including 1/11/2023 #22 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
December 21, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION by Plaintiff Sport Dimension, Inc. for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Hierl, Michael)
December 14, 2022 Filing 21 SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 12/14/2022. Mailed notice(vcf, )
December 14, 2022 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #9 is granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary transfer of the defendant domain names, a temporary asset restraint, expedited discovery, and service of process by email and/or electronic publication #10 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
December 13, 2022 Filing 19 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (jg, )
December 13, 2022 Filing 18 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jg, )
December 13, 2022 Filing 17 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jg, )
December 12, 2022 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sport Dimension, Inc. Exhibit 3 Part 5 of Rios Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
December 12, 2022 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sport Dimension, Inc. Exhibit 3 Part 4 of Rios Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
December 12, 2022 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sport Dimension, Inc. Exhibit 3 part 3 of Rios Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
December 12, 2022 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sport Dimension, Inc. Exhibit 3 Part 2 of Rios Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
December 12, 2022 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sport Dimension, Inc. Exhibit 3 Part 1 of Rios Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
December 12, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by Sport Dimension, Inc. in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #10 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rios Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Declaration Hierl Declaration, #5 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3)(Hierl, Michael)
December 12, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Sport Dimension, Inc. for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication (Hierl, Michael)
December 12, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Sport Dimension, Inc. for leave to file excess pages Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Hierl, Michael)
December 12, 2022 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Sport Dimension, Inc. (Hierl, Michael)
December 12, 2022 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sport Dimension, Inc. Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
December 12, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Sport Dimension, Inc. to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
December 12, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sport Dimension, Inc. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert)
December 12, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sport Dimension, Inc. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
December 12, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sport Dimension, Inc. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
December 12, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
December 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sport Dimension, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20128561. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael)
December 12, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, )
December 12, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sport Dimension, Inc. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sport Dimension, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Payton Mcmurray
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silfrae
Represented By: Jiyuan Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YKXSK
Represented By: Hua Chen
Represented By: Daniel I. Konieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joulli Store
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dongguanshisuyingshangmaoyouxiangongsi
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mora Tech
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: huaxuan
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Weitian Industrial Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuyu
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shenzhenshi shenghuashuo dianzishangwu youxiangongsi
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Rongxiner Network Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qingtian Diaocheng Trading Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Dali Industry Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Linglangxi Network Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tengjingyue
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yalita
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caitzr
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chengdulijingyaxiumaoyiyouxiangongsi
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: haoshengqiyue
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qingtian Yingying Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shenzhenshiyishengyangdianzishangwuyouxiangongsi
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sigeshangmao
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tianjinshidongfangsugouwangluokejiyouxiangongsi
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xuhua
Represented By: Lydia Pittaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?